This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/13/2022 at 08:02:45 (UTC).

VOORHEES v. AMERICAN AIRLINES INC et al

Case Summary

On 12/15/2021 VOORHEES filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against AMERICAN AIRLINES INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are JON D. LEVY and JOHN C. NIVISON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00359

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON D. LEVY

Referral Judge

JOHN C. NIVISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANNIE VOORHEES

Defendants

AMERICAN AIRLINES INC

JANE DOE FLIGHT ATTENDANT

JOHN DOE MANAGER

JANE DOES 1-5

JOHN DOES 1-5

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JED DAVIS

Attorney at JIM MITCHELL & JED DAVIS, P.A.

86 Winthrop Street, Suite One

Augusta, ME 04330

Defendant Attorneys

PHILLIP E. JOHNSON

Attorney at JOHNSON WEBBERT & YOUNG LLP

160 Capitol Street, Suite 3, Po Box 79

Augusta, ME 04330

RYAN M. SCHMITZ

Attorney at JOHNSON, WEBBERT & GARVAN, LLP

160 Capitol Street, Suite 3

Augusta, ME 04330

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time 60 days to file Stipulation of Dismissal by ANNIE VOORHEES Responses due by 3/4/2022. (DAVIS, JED) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Settlement by ANNIE VOORHEES (DAVIS, JED) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

7 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

7 #1

Supplement Proposed Amended Complaint

#7

(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court by ANNIE VOORHEES Responses due by 1/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(DAVIS, JED) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AMERICAN AIRLINES INC. (JOHNSON, PHILLIP) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/6/2022. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 5/13/2022. Motions due by 5/27/2022. Ready for Trial on 8/2/2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (aks) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by AMERICAN AIRLINES INC, JANE DOE FLIGHT ATTENDANT, JANE DOES 1-5, JOHN DOE MANAGER, JOHN DOES 1-5. (JOHNSON, PHILLIP) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

3 #9

Exhibit 2 Service of Process Transmittal Form

3 #8

Exh 1-G Scheduling Order

3 #7

Exh 1-F Defendants Answer to Complaint

3 #6

Exh 1-E Summons

3 #5

Exh 1-D Complaint

3 #4

Exh 1-C Civil Cover Sheet

3 #3

Exh 1-B Cover letter filing complaint

3 #2

Exh 1-A Docket Record

3 #1

Exhibit 1 State Court Record

#3

(#3) STATE COURT RECORD and Affidavit (see notice of removal) by AMERICAN AIRLINES INC, JANE DOE FLIGHT ATTENDANT, JANE DOES 1-5, JOHN DOE MANAGER, JOHN DOES 1-5. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Record, #2 Exh 1-A Docket Record, #3 Exh 1-B Cover letter filing complaint, #4 Exh 1-C Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exh 1-D Complaint, #6 Exh 1-E Summons, #7 Exh 1-F Defendants Answer to Complaint, #8 Exh 1-G Scheduling Order, #9 Exhibit 2 Service of Process Transmittal Form)(bfa) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketReset Deadlines per order #11: Stipulation of Dismissal due by 4/15/2022. (clp) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Extend Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal. Time is extended to April 14, 2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time 60 days to file Stipulation of Dismissal by ANNIE VOORHEES Responses due by 3/4/2022. (DAVIS, JED) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Settlement by Counsel for the Plaintiff and PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT: Counsel having advised the Court on January 14, 2022 per filing ECF #8 that settlement has been effected by mutual agreement of the parties herein, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall complete the settlement of this matter within thirty (30) days of this date and cause to be filed a stipulation of dismissal of this matter with prejudice and without costs, failing which, the case will be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.1(a). Stipulation of Dismissal due by 2/14/2022. By DEPUTY CLERK: Charity Pelletier. (clp) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Settlement by ANNIE VOORHEES (DAVIS, JED) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court by ANNIE VOORHEES Responses due by 1/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(DAVIS, JED) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AMERICAN AIRLINES INC. (JOHNSON, PHILLIP) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/6/2022. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 5/13/2022. Motions due by 5/27/2022. Ready for Trial on 8/2/2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (aks) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by AMERICAN AIRLINES INC, JANE DOE FLIGHT ATTENDANT, JANE DOES 1-5, JOHN DOE MANAGER, JOHN DOES 1-5. (JOHNSON, PHILLIP) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2591768.), filed by JANE DOES 1-5, JANE DOE FLIGHT ATTENDANT, JOHN DOES 1-5, AMERICAN AIRLINES INC, JOHN DOE MANAGER.(JOHNSON, PHILLIP) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketSet Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/22/2021. (bfa) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATE COURT RECORD and Affidavit (see notice of removal) by AMERICAN AIRLINES INC, JANE DOE FLIGHT ATTENDANT, JANE DOES 1-5, JOHN DOE MANAGER, JOHN DOES 1-5. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Record, #2 Exh 1-A Docket Record, #3 Exh 1-B Cover letter filing complaint, #4 Exh 1-C Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exh 1-D Complaint, #6 Exh 1-E Summons, #7 Exh 1-F Defendants Answer to Complaint, #8 Exh 1-G Scheduling Order, #9 Exhibit 2 Service of Process Transmittal Form)(bfa) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kennebec County Superior Court, case number CV-21-196. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by JANE DOES 1-5, JANE DOE FLIGHT ATTENDANT, JOHN DOES 1-5, AMERICAN AIRLINES INC, JOHN DOE MANAGER. (Service of Process Deadline 3/15/2022) Fee due by 12/17/2021.(bfa) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN AIRLINES INC, FKA US Airways is a litigant