This case was last updated from PACER on 10/31/2021 at 07:15:17 (UTC).

Volz v. Fort Wayne City of

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 Volz filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Fort Wayne City of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly A Brady and Susan L Collins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00340

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Holly A Brady

Referral Judge

Susan L Collins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Holly H. Volz

Defendants

City of Fort Wayne

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Fort Wayne City of

Not Classified By Court

C Erik Chickedantz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher C Myers

Attorney at Christopher C Myers & Associates

809 S Calhoun St Ste 400

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Ilene M Smith

Attorney at Christopher C Myers & Associates

809 S Calhoun St Ste 400

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Defendant Attorney

Gary D Johnson

Attorney at Beckman Lawson LLP

201 W Wayne St

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A (COD)

1 #2

Exhibit B (The Determination Hearing)

1 #3

Exhibit C (Mixed-Cause Finding)

1 #4

Exhibit D (NORTS)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Proposed Summons

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary D Johnson on behalf of Fort Wayne City of (Johnson, Gary) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#4

(#4) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Fort Wayne City of ; answer due by 10/26/2021. (Johnson, Gary) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2021 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#6

(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#7

(#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Myers, Christopher) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Fort Wayne City of.(Johnson, Gary) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Ilene M Smith on behalf of Holly H. Volz (Smith, Ilene) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE:The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 12/22/2021.The last date for the completion of all expert discovery is 9/23/2022. Deadline to complete all discovery is 9/30/2022. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiff by 3/25/2022; and from Defendant by 4/25/2022. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due every six weeks until trial. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff is 1/21/2022; as to Defendant is 2/21/2022. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 10/31/2022 with any response due 28 days thereafter and any reply due 14 days after the filing of a response, consistent with Local Rule 56-1(b) and (c). The parties have agreed upon Erik Chickedantz as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 10/26/2021. (bas) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE:The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 12/22/2021.The last date for the completion of all expert discovery is 9/23/2022. Deadline to complete all discovery is 9/30/2022. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiff by 3/25/2022; and from Defendant by 4/25/2022. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due every six weeks until trial. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff is 1/21/2022; as to Defendant is 2/21/2022. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 10/31/2022 with any response due 28 days thereafter and any reply due 14 days after the filing of a response, consistent with Local Rule 56-1(b) and (c). The parties have agreed upon Erik Chickedantz as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 10/26/2021. (bas) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 10/26/2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Ilene Smith. Dft appeared by atty Gary Johnson. The #7 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Erik Chickedantz appointed as Mediator. Atty Johnson to notify Mediator by letter, copy to atty Smith. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/16/2021. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Ilene M Smith on behalf of Holly H. Volz (Smith, Ilene) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Fort Wayne City of.(Johnson, Gary) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Myers, Christopher) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Answer ddl set for 10/26/2021 pursuant to #4 Agreed Notice. (lns) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2021 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Fort Wayne City of ; answer due by 10/26/2021. (Johnson, Gary) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary D Johnson on behalf of Fort Wayne City of (Johnson, Gary) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Fort Wayne City of. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (lhc) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketJudge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. *NEW CASE* (lhc) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against City of Fort Wayne( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4674256.), filed by Holly H. Volz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (COD), #2 Exhibit B (The Determination Hearing), #3 Exhibit C (Mixed-Cause Finding), #4 Exhibit D (NORTS), #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Myers, Christopher) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary D Johnson