Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/21/2020 at 08:10:43 (UTC).

Volume Medical Aesthetics PC v. Candela Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 07/23/2020 Volume Medical Aesthetics PC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Candela Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E. McDermott and Dale S. Fischer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06545

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Volume Medical Aesthetics PC

Regina Y Choe

Defendants, Counter Defendants and Counter Claimants

Candela Corporation

Does 1-10, inclusive

American Express

Plaintiffs, Counter Defendants and Counter Claimants

Volume Medical Aesthetics PC

Candela Corporation

Regina Choe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Fernando Leone

Attorney at Leone and Associates

207 North Broadway Avenue Suite F

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Counter Defendant, Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jamie Olivia Kendall

Attorney at Doll Amir and Eley LLP

725 South Figueroa Street Suite 3275

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Gregory L Doll

Attorney at Doll Amir and Eley LLP

725 South Figueroa Street Suite 3275

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Plaintiff, Counter Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Fernando Leone

Attorney at Leone and Associates

207 North Broadway Avenue Suite F

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Jamie Olivia Kendall

Attorney at Doll Amir and Eley LLP

725 South Figueroa Street Suite 3275

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Gregory L Doll

Attorney at Doll Amir and Eley LLP

725 South Figueroa Street Suite 3275

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

24 #1

Proposed Order

#24

(#24) First STIPULATION to Continue SCHEDULING HEARING from SEPTEMBER 28, 2020 to NOVEMBER 17, 2020 filed by plaintiff Volume Medical Aesthetics PC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leone, Fernando) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#23

(#23) ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), Counterclaim #22 Candela Corporation filed by counter-defendant Regina Choe.(Attorney Fernando Leone added to party Regina Choe(pty:cd))(Leone, Fernando) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#22

(#22) ANSWER to Amended Complaint #18 (First Amended), COUNTERCLAIM against Candela Corporation filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Candela Corporation.(Kendall, Jamie) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#21

(#21) 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #18 as to defendant American Express. (lom) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#20

(#20) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Summons Request. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#19

(#19) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Complaint #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#17

(#17) COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($435 paid on 06/06/2020, receipt number n/a), filed by plaintiff Volume Medical Aesthetics PC.(Leone, Fernando) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#18

(#18) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #17 against Defendants American Express, Candela Corporation, Does filed by Plaintiffs Volume Medical Aesthetics PC, Regina Choe. (lom) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE to Adverse Parties of Removal of Action to the United States District Court for the Central District of California Under 28 U.S.C. 1441(a), 28 U.S.C. 1332 (Diversity) filed by Defendant Candela Corporation. (Kendall, Jamie) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#7

(#7) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Candela Corporation, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, #6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 07/24/2020. (Kendall, Jamie) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#6

(#7) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Candela Corporation, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, #6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 07/24/2020. (Kendall, Jamie) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#5

(#7) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Candela Corporation, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, #6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 07/24/2020. (Kendall, Jamie) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#4

(#7) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Candela Corporation, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, #6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 07/24/2020. (Kendall, Jamie) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#3

(#7) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Candela Corporation, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, #6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 07/24/2020. (Kendall, Jamie) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#2

(#7) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Candela Corporation, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, #6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 07/24/2020. (Kendall, Jamie) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

1 #1

*Restricted*

#1

(#7) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Candela Corporation, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, #6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 07/24/2020. (Kendall, Jamie) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Stipulation to Continue. #24 The Court continues the scheduling conference to 10/26/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) First STIPULATION to Continue SCHEDULING HEARING from SEPTEMBER 28, 2020 to NOVEMBER 17, 2020 filed by plaintiff Volume Medical Aesthetics PC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leone, Fernando) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), Counterclaim #22 Candela Corporation filed by counter-defendant Regina Choe.(Attorney Fernando Leone added to party Regina Choe(pty:cd))(Leone, Fernando) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ANSWER to Amended Complaint #18 (First Amended), COUNTERCLAIM against Candela Corporation filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Candela Corporation.(Kendall, Jamie) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #18 as to defendant American Express. (lom) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Summons Request. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Complaint #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($435 paid on 06/06/2020, receipt number n/a), filed by plaintiff Volume Medical Aesthetics PC.(Leone, Fernando) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #17 against Defendants American Express, Candela Corporation, Does filed by Plaintiffs Volume Medical Aesthetics PC, Regina Choe. (lom) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: The stipulation at dkt. #15 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against Volume Medical Aesthetics PC, Regina Choe filed by Defendant and Counter Claimant Candela Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Email Regarding Purchase Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Terms and Conditions of Sale, #4 Proof of Service)(Kendall, Jamie) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE to Adverse Parties of Removal of Action to the United States District Court for the Central District of California Under 28 U.S.C. 1441(a), 28 U.S.C. 1332 (Diversity) filed by Defendant Candela Corporation. (Kendall, Jamie) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Candela Corporation, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, #6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 07/24/2020. (Kendall, Jamie) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (car) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Candela Corporation, Does 1-10, filed by Plaintiff Volume Medical Aesthetics PC. Filed in State Court on 6/19/2020 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Candela Corporation, identifying Syneron, Inc., Candela Holdings, LLC, Candela Midco LLC, Candela Medical Holdings LLC, Apax IX GP Co. Ltd.. (Kendall, Jamie) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Candela Corporation. (Kendall, Jamie) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV23328 Receipt No: ACACDC-27329540 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Candela Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Jamie Olivia Kendall added to party Candela Corporation(pty:dft))(Kendall, Jamie) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Candela Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS AMEX BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory L Doll

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jamie Olivia Kendall