This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/17/2022 at 09:08:21 (UTC).

Voltz v. Standard Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 Voltz filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Standard Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Emily C. Marks and Jerusha T. Adams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00302

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Emily C. Marks

Referral Judge

Jerusha T. Adams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deborah Voltz

Defendants

Standard Insurance Company

Auburn University

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey Stuart Daniel

Attorney at Law Office of Jeff S. Daniel PC

Po Box 131323

Birmingham, AL 35213

Defendant Attorney

Jason Allen Walters

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

1819 Fifth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/22/2023 at 11:00 AM in CR 2A, the Frank M. Johnson, Jr. U. S. Courthouse, Montgomery, Alabama before Chief Judge Emily C. Marks; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/15/2023; Jury Selection & Jury Trial set for 8/7/2023 at 10:00 AM in Opelika, Alabama before Chief Judge Emily C. Marks; Dispositive & Daubert Motions due by 2/22/2023; Mediation Notice due by 1/30/2023; Amended Pleadings due by 9/26/2022; Discovery due by 1/23/2023, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 7/11/2022. (Furn: calendar,WS) (es, ) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#5

(#5) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Standard Insurance Company, Deborah Voltz.. (Walters, Jason) Modified on 7/7/2022 to add plf and dft as filers (es, ). (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#4

(#4) RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/21/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 6/30/2022. (cwl, ) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the ( #1 - 3) joint motion to extend deadlines and continue scheduling conference is DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 6/10/2022. (es, ) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

1 #30

Receipt

1 #29

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #28

Exhibit 25

1 #26

Exhibit 23

1 #24

Exhibit 21

1 #22

Exhibit 19

1 #21

Exhibit 18

1 #18

Exhibit 15

1 #16

Exhibit 13

1 #12

Exhibit 9

1 #10

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 3

1 #5

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Joint Motion to Extend/Continue

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/22/2023 at 11:00 AM in CR 2A, the Frank M. Johnson, Jr. U. S. Courthouse, Montgomery, Alabama before Chief Judge Emily C. Marks; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/15/2023; Jury Selection & Jury Trial set for 8/7/2023 at 10:00 AM in Opelika, Alabama before Chief Judge Emily C. Marks; Dispositive & Daubert Motions due by 2/22/2023; Mediation Notice due by 1/30/2023; Amended Pleadings due by 9/26/2022; Discovery due by 1/23/2023, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 7/11/2022. (Furn: calendar,WS) (es, ) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Standard Insurance Company, Deborah Voltz.. (Walters, Jason) Modified on 7/7/2022 to add plf and dft as filers (es, ). (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/21/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 6/30/2022. (cwl, ) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the ( #1 - 3) joint motion to extend deadlines and continue scheduling conference is DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 6/10/2022. (es, ) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Standard Insurance Company. (wcl, ) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Filing to State Court by Standard Insurance Company re: filing of #1 Notice of Removal. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, ) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT MOTION to Extend Deadlines and MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Standard Insurance Company, Deborah Voltz. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, ) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER to Complaint by Standard Insurance Company. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, ) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Deborah Voltz. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, ) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT against Standard Insurance Company, filed by Deborah Voltz. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, ) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Standard Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Lee County, Alabama, case number 43-cv-2021-900305.00. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602066861) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Answer - Standard Ins, #3 Joint Motion to Extend/Continue, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Civil Cover Sheet, #30 Receipt)(wcl, ) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auburn University is a litigant

Latest cases where The Standard Insurance Co. Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason A Walters