This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 07:20:36 (UTC).

Voltstar Technologies, Inc. v. Superior Communications, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 Voltstar Technologies, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Superior Communications, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles F. Eick and John A. Kronstadt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-07355

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Voltstar Technologies, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Superior Communications, Inc.

AT&T Mobility, LLC

AT and T Mobility, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Jonah Adam Grossbardt

Attorney at SRIPLAW PA

1801 Century Park East Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jeffrey M Singletary

Attorney at Snell and Wilmer LLP

600 Anton Boulevard Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-7689

Andrew Sterling Flior

Attorney at Snell and Wilmer LLP

600 Anton Boulevard Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

#1

(#22) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to AT and T Mobility, LLC answer now due 10/17/2019; Superior Communications, Inc. answer now due 10/17/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants AT and T Mobility, LLC; Superior Communications, Inc..(Attorney Jeffrey M Singletary added to party AT and T Mobility, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey M Singletary added to party Superior Communications, Inc.(pty:dft))(Singletary, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#3

(#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): The Certification of Interested Parties was Incomplete. (et) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#26

(#26) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Superior Communications, Inc., (Singletary, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#25

(#25) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Voltstar Technologies, Inc. filed by Defendant Superior Communications, Inc..(Singletary, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#24

(#24) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant AT and T Mobility, LLC, (Singletary, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#23

(#23) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant AT and T Mobility, LLC.(Singletary, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#22

(#22) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to AT and T Mobility, LLC answer now due 10/17/2019; Superior Communications, Inc. answer now due 10/17/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants AT and T Mobility, LLC; Superior Communications, Inc..(Attorney Jeffrey M Singletary added to party AT and T Mobility, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey M Singletary added to party Superior Communications, Inc.(pty:dft))(Singletary, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#21

(#21) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc., upon Defendant AT and T Mobility, LLC served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation Systems, Inc. as Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#20

(#20) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#19

(#19) ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE PATENT PILOT PROGRAM by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 2:19-cv-07355 JAK(Ex). (rn) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc., identifying Horizon Adventures, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Superior Communications, Inc., (Singletary, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Voltstar Technologies, Inc. filed by Defendant Superior Communications, Inc..(Singletary, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant AT and T Mobility, LLC, (Singletary, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant AT and T Mobility, LLC.(Singletary, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to AT and T Mobility, LLC answer now due 10/17/2019; Superior Communications, Inc. answer now due 10/17/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants AT and T Mobility, LLC; Superior Communications, Inc..(Attorney Jeffrey M Singletary added to party AT and T Mobility, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey M Singletary added to party Superior Communications, Inc.(pty:dft))(Singletary, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc., upon Defendant AT and T Mobility, LLC served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation Systems, Inc. as Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE PATENT PILOT PROGRAM by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 2:19-cv-07355 JAK(Ex). (rn) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc., identifying Horizon Adventures, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc. identifying Horizon Adventures, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): The Certification of Interested Parties was Incomplete. (et) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant AT and T Mobility, LLC. (et) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Superior Communications, Inc. (et) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc., (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24319634 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Attorney Jonah Adam Grossbardt added to party Voltstar Technologies, Inc.(pty:pla))(Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.