This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/07/2020 at 08:01:00 (UTC).

Volterra Semiconductor LLC, v. Monolithic Power Systems, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/09/2019 Volterra Semiconductor LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Monolithic Power Systems, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02240

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Volterra Semiconductor LLC,

Defendant

Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert M. Oakes

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

David M. Barkan

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Russell

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Lionel M. Lavenue

Nathan Roger Hoeschen

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Karen Elizabeth Keller

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit C

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint to February 28, 2020 filed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. answer due 2/28/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/27/2020. (fms) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint to February 28, 2020 - filed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney David M. Barkan for Volterra Semiconductor LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Lionel M. Lavenue for Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lionel M. Lavenue filed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/30/2019. (fms) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lionel M. Lavenue - filed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (and proposed order) to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 29, 2020 filed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. answer due 1/29/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/30/2019. (fms) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (and proposed order) to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 29, 2020 - filed by Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Elizabeth Keller on behalf of Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David M. Barkan filed by Volterra Semiconductor LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/13/2019. (fms) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David M. Barkan - filed by Volterra Semiconductor LLC,. (Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Volterra Semiconductor LLC,. Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Monolithic Power Systems, INC. on 12/9/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (apk) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Maxim Integrated Products, Inc. for Volterra Semiconductor LLC, filed by Volterra Semiconductor LLC,. (apk) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,362,986 ;US 7,525,408 ;US 7,772,955. (apk) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Monolithic Power Systems, INC. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2796597.) - filed by Volterra Semiconductor LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, # 5 Patent/Trademark Report)(apk) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Monolithic Power Systems, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert M. Oakes