This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/22/2020 at 08:20:23 (UTC).

VOLPE v. OWENS-BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/23/2020 VOLPE filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against OWENS-BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kim R. Gibson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00081

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kim R. Gibson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHANDEN VOLPE

Defendant

OWENS-BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Groh

Attorney at Murphy Law Group, LLC

Eight Penn Center, Suite 2000, 1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd.

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHANDEN VOLPE. OWENS-BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER, INC. waiver sent on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Groh, Michael) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (krh) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to OWENS-BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER, INC. (jjg) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against OWENS-BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5574795), filed by SHANDEN VOLPE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (jjg) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHANDEN VOLPE. OWENS-BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER, INC. waiver sent on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Groh, Michael) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • DocketFINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's #administrative order for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI) (Entered: 05/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF on May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account in order to electronically file after our conversion to NextGen. The second step will be to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains a special character (such as &, @, $, *), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to (1) review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020 and (2) ensure that your primary email address to receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEF) is accurate. Failure to provide an accurate email address may result in a delay in receiving NEFs after the Court converts to NextGen. (Administrator, ) (ADI) (Entered: 04/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (krh) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to OWENS-BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER, INC. (jjg) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against OWENS-BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5574795), filed by SHANDEN VOLPE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (jjg) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL GROH