This case was last updated from PACER on 12/12/2020 at 08:55:15 (UTC).

Volovets v. Trump et al

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 Volovets filed an Other lawsuit against Trump. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lewis J. Liman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-08504

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lewis J. Liman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Naum I. Volouets

Staten Island, NY 10306

Naum I. Volovets

Staten Island, NY 10306

Defendants

Kristina Kvien

Mike Pompeo

Donald J. Trump

William Barr

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) TRANSFER ORDER: Plaintiff has consented to electronic service of Court documents. (ECF 2.) The Court directs the Clerk of Court to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. This order closes this action. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 10/15/2020) (va) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#2

(#2) PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Naum Volovets consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Naum I. Volovets. (rdz) Modified on 10/16/2020 (sac). (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against William Barr, Kristina Kvien, Mike Pompeo, Donald J. Trump. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401268110)Document filed by Naum I. Volovets.(rdz) Modified on 10/16/2020 (sac). (Entered: 10/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketReceived e-mail from the United States District Court - Eastern District of New York acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 1:20-cv-05082, filed on 10/22/2020. (sjo) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York. (va) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) TRANSFER ORDER: Plaintiff has consented to electronic service of Court documents. (ECF 2.) The Court directs the Clerk of Court to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. This order closes this action. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 10/15/2020) (va) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to William Barr, Kristina Kvien, Mike Pompeo, Donald J. Trump..(rdz) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Naum Volovets consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Naum I. Volovets. (rdz) Modified on 10/16/2020 (sac). (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (rdz) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (rdz) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against William Barr, Kristina Kvien, Mike Pompeo, Donald J. Trump. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401268110)Document filed by Naum I. Volovets.(rdz) Modified on 10/16/2020 (sac). (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less