This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2021 at 07:50:34 (UTC).

VOLMER v. BRIGGS & STRATTON, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 VOLMER filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against BRIGGS STRATTON, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark Falk and Brian R. Martinotti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-10791

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark Falk

Presiding Judge

Brian R. Martinotti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN VOLMER

Defendants

HURRICANE, INC.

BRIGGS & STRATTON, LLC

FERRIS INDUSTRIES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES C. DENORSCIA

Attorney at MARDER, NASS & WINER, PLLC

450 Seventh Avenue, 37Th Floor

New York, NY 10123

Defendant Attorneys

DOUGLAS V. SANCHEZ

Attorney at CRUSER, MITCHELL & SANCHEZ, LLC

50 Tice Boulevard, Suite 363

Woodcliff Lake, NJ 07677

NANCY MCDONALD

Attorney at McELROY, DEUTSCH & MULVANEY, ESQS.

1300 Mt. Kemble Avenue, P.O. Box 2075

Morristown, NJ 07962-2075

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Ex A. - Filings in State Court

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Certification Certification of Service

#2

2 #1

Certificate of Service

#3

#4

4 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Marvin Butler

#5

5 #1

Certificate of Service of Certification of Damages

#6

#7

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER: There shall be a telephone conference before the Undersigned on July 20, 2021 at 2:45 p.m. Participants will dial (1-888-684-8852) and the Access Code (1364268#) to join in on the conference call. If counsel are not available for the conference call or have any questions, please email chambers at mf_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 7/1/21.(LM, ) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk: Status Conference via telephone held on 6/29/2021. (Court Reporter/Recorder NONE.) (LM, ) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by DOUGLAS V. SANCHEZ on behalf of HURRICANE, INC. (SANCHEZ, DOUGLAS) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES C. DENORSCIA on behalf of JOHN VOLMER (DENORSCIA, JAMES) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certification of Andrew F. Bain on behalf of BRIGGS & STRATTON, LLC Re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Answer to Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service of Certification of Damages)(MCDONALD, NANCY) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Donald H. Carlson re #1 Notice of Removal, by BRIGGS & STRATTON, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Marvin Butler)(MCDONALD, NANCY) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 6/29/2021 at 11:30 AM before Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 5/13/21. (LM, ) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by BRIGGS & STRATTON, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MCDONALD, NANCY) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. (jr) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BRIGGS & STRATTON, LLC from Superior Court of New Jersey, Bergen County, case number BER-L-1426-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12440200), filed by BRIGGS & STRATTON, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A. - Filings in State Court, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certification Certification of Service)(MCDONALD, NANCY) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hurricane, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where FERRY INDUSTRIES INC. AN OHIO CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BRIGGS & STRATTON CORPORATION is a litigant