This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2023 at 06:49:32 (UTC).

VOLLMAN v. AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 VOLLMAN filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-02564

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDUARDO C. ROBRENO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

GREG VOLLMAN

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

A.O. SMITH CORPORATION

AURORA PUMP COMPANY

BURNHAM, LLC

CARRIER CORPORATION

COMPUDYNE, LLC

CRANE COMPANY

EATON CORPORATION

Cross Defendants, Cross Claimants and Defendants

AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION

Advanced Thermal Hydronics, LLC

A.O. SMITH CORPORATION

BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC.,

BURNHAM, LLC

CARRIER CORPORATION

COMPUDYNE, LLC

COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC

CRANE COMPANY

EATON CORPORATION

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

GREG VOLLMAN

AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION

Advanced Thermal Hydronics, LLC

A.O. SMITH CORPORATION

AURORA PUMP COMPANY

AUTOMATION INDUSTRIES, INC.

BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC.,

BRAND INSULATIONS, INC.

BURNHAM, LLC

CARRIER CORPORATION

CLEAVER BROOKS, INC.

COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORPORATION

COMPUDYNE, LLC

COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC

CRANE COMPANY

DAP PRODUCTS

EATON CORPORATION

EASCO BOILER CORPORATION

193 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

JASON B. DUNCAN

Attorney at Law Offices of Peter Angelos

2001 N. Front Street, Suite 330

Harrisburg, PA 17102

Cross Defendant, Cross Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

ERIC J. KADISH

Attorney at MARON, MARVEL, BRADLEY & ANDERSON P.A.

Three Logan Square, 1717 Arch St Ste 3710

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JAMES P. HADDEN

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY & ANDERSON PA

Three Logan Square

Hillary Cullen Rankin

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius

One Oxford Centre, 32Nd Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

JOHN S. HOWARTH

Attorney at WILBRAHAM, LAWLER & BUBA

1818 Market Street, Suite 3100

Philadelphia, PA 19103-3631

INGRID H. GRAFF

Attorney at MARSHALL, DENNEHEY, WARNER, COLEMAN & GOGGIN, P.C.

2000 Market Street, 23Rd Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103-4797

TIFFANY GIANGIULIO

Attorney at MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN & GOGGIN

2000 Market St Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

JASON B. DUNCAN

Attorney at Law Offices of Peter Angelos

2001 N. Front Street, Suite 330

Harrisburg, PA 17102

JOHN S. HOWARTH

Attorney at WILBRAHAM, LAWLER & BUBA

1818 Market Street, Suite 3100

Philadelphia, PA 19103-3631

ERIC J. KADISH

Attorney at MARON, MARVEL, BRADLEY & ANDERSON P.A.

Three Logan Square, 1717 Arch St Ste 3710

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JAMES P. HADDEN

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY & ANDERSON PA

Three Logan Square

CHRISTINE P. BUSCH

Attorney at MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN & GOGGIN

2000 Market Street, Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Hillary Cullen Rankin

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius

One Oxford Centre, 32Nd Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

CORY C. SIDELSKY

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

1650 Market Street, Suite 5000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

ADAM A. DESIPIO

Attorney at DLA PIPER LLP

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

INGRID H. GRAFF

Attorney at MARSHALL, DENNEHEY, WARNER, COLEMAN & GOGGIN, P.C.

2000 Market Street, 23Rd Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103-4797

TIFFANY GIANGIULIO

Attorney at MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN & GOGGIN

2000 Market St Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Other Attorneys

TIFFANY F. TURNER

Attorney at DICKIE MCCAMEY & CHILCOTE

1650 Arch Street, Suite 2110

Philadelphia, PA 19103

DAWNN E. BRIDDELL

Attorney at DUANE MORRIS LLP

1940 Route 70 East, Suite 200

Cherry Hill, NJ 08003

JOHN P. MCSHEA

Attorney at MCSHEA LAW FIRM PC

1500 Market St Suite 4000

Philadelphia, PA 19102

CHRISTOPHER N. SANTORO

Attorney at MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN & GOGGIN

2000 Market Street, Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JOSEPH I FONTAK

Attorney at LEADER & BERKON LLP

1515 Market St Suite 1200

Philadelphia, PA 19102

DAMIAN JACKSON

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP

10 Sentry Parkway, Suite 200

Blue Bell, PA 19422

W. MATTHEW REBER

Attorney at KELLEY JASON MCGUIRE & SPINELLI & HANNA

Two Liberty Place, Suite 1900

Philadelphia, PA 19102

STEPHANIE A. FOX

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY & ANDERSON PA

1201 N. Market Street, Suite 900

Wilmington, DE 19801

41 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#258

(#258) NOTICE of Appearance by Hillary Cullen Rankin on behalf of CLEAVER BROOKS, INC.(f/k/a Aqua-Chem, Inc., d/b/a Cleaver-Brooks Division) with Notice of Withdrawal, Certificate of Service(Rankin, Hillary) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

#257

(#257) NOTICE by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION Proposed Scheduled Order Agreed Upon all Parties (JASONS, CATHERINE) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

#256

(#256) ANSWER to #221 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim (Second Amended Complaint), Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by PARAMOUNT GLOBAL(f/k/a Viacom/CBS Inc. & CBS Corp., a Delaware Corp., f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporaton, A Pennsylvania Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation).(MCSHEA, JOHN) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

#255

(#255) ANSWER to #221 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim (Second Amended Complaint), Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(MCSHEA, JOHN) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

#254

(#254) NOTICE of Appearance by ALYSON WALKER LOTMAN on behalf of FORD MOTOR COMPANY with Certificate of Service(LOTMAN, ALYSON) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

#253

(#253) NOTICE of Appearance by SHARON L. CAFFREY on behalf of FORD MOTOR COMPANY with Certificate of Service(CAFFREY, SHARON) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

#252

(#252) ORDER THAT THIS MATTER HAVING BEEN REFERRED BY THE HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF SHALL CONFER WITH OPPOSING COUNSEL, AND WITHIN FOURTEEN DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER COUNSEL SHALL SUBMIT A PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 12/5/22. 12/5/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

#251

(#251) ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR PRETRIAL DISCOVERY, SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, AND TRIAL PREPARATION THE COURT HAS IDENTIFIED THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE AS BEING APPROPRIATE FOR REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY TO CONDUCT PRETRIAL PROCEDURES, SUPERVISION OF DISCOVERY, SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES, AND PREPARATION FOR TRIAL. THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE MAY ENTER SUCH ORDERS AS MAY BE NECESSARY TO FACILITATE THESE TASKS. INQUIRIES RELATING TO THESE CASES AND ALL MATTERS SCHEDULED HEREUNDER MAY BE DIRECTED TO THE CHAMBERS OF THE HONORABLE MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY; AS OUTLINED HEREIN SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/14/22. 12/5/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

#221

(#255) ANSWER to #221 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim (Second Amended Complaint), Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(MCSHEA, JOHN) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

5 #6

Certificate of Service

5 #5

Text of Proposed Order

5 #4

Exhibit C

5 #2

Exhibit A

5 #1

Memorandum

5 #5

Main Document

#3

(#6) ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS FILED BY JOHN CRANE AND FORD MOTOR COMPANY #3 #5 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTIONS ARE GRANTED TO THE EXTENT THAT THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFFS MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN AUGUST 3, 2022. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/12/22.7/12/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Smiths Group PLC by JOHN CRANE, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JOHN CRANE, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16019044), filed by JOHN CRANE, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/1/2022) (sbt). NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JOHN CRANE, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16019044), filed by JOHN CRANE, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/1/2022) (sbt). (Entered: 07/01/2022)

291 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#258) NOTICE of Appearance by Hillary Cullen Rankin on behalf of CLEAVER BROOKS, INC.(f/k/a Aqua-Chem, Inc., d/b/a Cleaver-Brooks Division) with Notice of Withdrawal, Certificate of Service(Rankin, Hillary) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#257) NOTICE by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION Proposed Scheduled Order Agreed Upon all Parties (JASONS, CATHERINE) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#256) ANSWER to #221 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim (Second Amended Complaint), Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by PARAMOUNT GLOBAL(f/k/a Viacom/CBS Inc. & CBS Corp., a Delaware Corp., f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporaton, A Pennsylvania Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation).(MCSHEA, JOHN) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#255) ANSWER to #221 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim (Second Amended Complaint), Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(MCSHEA, JOHN) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#254) NOTICE of Appearance by ALYSON WALKER LOTMAN on behalf of FORD MOTOR COMPANY with Certificate of Service(LOTMAN, ALYSON) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#253) NOTICE of Appearance by SHARON L. CAFFREY on behalf of FORD MOTOR COMPANY with Certificate of Service(CAFFREY, SHARON) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#252) ORDER THAT THIS MATTER HAVING BEEN REFERRED BY THE HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF SHALL CONFER WITH OPPOSING COUNSEL, AND WITHIN FOURTEEN DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER COUNSEL SHALL SUBMIT A PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 12/5/22. 12/5/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#251) ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR PRETRIAL DISCOVERY, SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, AND TRIAL PREPARATION THE COURT HAS IDENTIFIED THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE AS BEING APPROPRIATE FOR REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY TO CONDUCT PRETRIAL PROCEDURES, SUPERVISION OF DISCOVERY, SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES, AND PREPARATION FOR TRIAL. THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE MAY ENTER SUCH ORDERS AS MAY BE NECESSARY TO FACILITATE THESE TASKS. INQUIRIES RELATING TO THESE CASES AND ALL MATTERS SCHEDULED HEREUNDER MAY BE DIRECTED TO THE CHAMBERS OF THE HONORABLE MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY; AS OUTLINED HEREIN SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/14/22. 12/5/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#250) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by W.W. GRAINGER, INC..(REBER, W.) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#249) ANSWER to #211 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GTE OPERATIONS SUPPORT, INC..(BOYD, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
238 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(MCSHEA, JOHN) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN P. MCSHEA on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY with Certificate of Service(MCSHEA, JOHN) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including ESAB Corporation by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC..(FONTAK, JOSEPH) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH I FONTAK on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (FONTAK, JOSEPH) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS FILED BY JOHN CRANE AND FORD MOTOR COMPANY #3 #5 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTIONS ARE GRANTED TO THE EXTENT THAT THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFFS MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN AUGUST 3, 2022. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/12/22.7/12/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR FAILURE TO ESTABLISH PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(BRIDDELL, DAWNN) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • Docket(#4) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (ke) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JOHN CRANE, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(TURNER, TIFFANY) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Smiths Group PLC by JOHN CRANE, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JOHN CRANE, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16019044), filed by JOHN CRANE, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/1/2022) (sbt). NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JOHN CRANE, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16019044), filed by JOHN CRANE, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/1/2022) (sbt). (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EASCO BOILER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Flexible Technologies Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where COMPUDYNE CORP (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN is a litigant

Latest cases where COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORPORATION is a litigant