This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:11:18 (UTC).

Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Volkswagen Group of America, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas M. Durkin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07983

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas M. Durkin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.

Defendant

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Allyson M. Martin

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:At the request of plaintiff, the 12/16/2019 notice motion date is vacated.Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#11

(#11) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (pj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#10

(#10) MAILED Trademark Report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (pj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for leave to file #6 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/16/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for leave to file #6 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/12/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16504500. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:At the request of plaintiff, the 12/16/2019 notice motion date is vacated.Mailed notice (srn, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (pj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MAILED Trademark Report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (pj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for leave to file #6 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/16/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for leave to file #6 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/12/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16504500. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.