This case was last updated from PACER on 07/26/2020 at 12:36:53 (UTC).

Volga-Dnepr UK Ltd v. The Boeing Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 Volga-Dnepr UK Ltd filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against The Boeing Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ricardo S. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00800

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ricardo S. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Volga-Dnepr UK Ltd

Defendants

Boeing Commercial Airplanes

The Boeing Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Heidi Brooks Bradley

Attorney at LANE POWELL PC (SEA)

1420 Fifth Ave Ste 4200, Po Box 91302

Seattle, WA 98111-9402

David M. Schoeggl

Attorney at LANE POWELL PC (SEA)

1420 Fifth Ave Ste 4200, Po Box 91302

Seattle, WA 98111-9402

Joseph D Adamson

Attorney at LANE POWELL PC (SEA)

1420 Fifth Ave Ste 4200, Po Box 91302

Seattle, WA 98111-9402

Stephania Camp Denton

Attorney at LANE POWELL PC (SEA)

1420 Fifth Ave Ste 4200, Po Box 91302

Seattle, WA 98111-9402

Michael Mackenzie Brown

Attorney at LANE POWELL PC (SEA)

1420 Fifth Ave Ste 4200, Po Box 91302

Seattle, WA 98111-9402

Defendant Attorneys

Eric B Wolff

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Laura Hill

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Eric J Weiss

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Harry H Schneider, Jr.

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 5-8. (Schoeggl, David) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#29

(#29) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stephania Camp Denton on behalf of Plaintiff Volga-Dnepr UK Ltd. (Denton, Stephania) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#28

(#28) ORDER denying Plaintiff's #2 Motion to seal documents and statements filed in connection with its complaint and motion for temporary restraining order. The CLERK SHALL UNSEAL Dkts. #3 , #7 , #8 , and #9 no earlier than ten (10) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#27

(#27) DECLARATION of Process Server of Service upon The Boeing Company; served on 5/29/2020, by Plaintiff Volga-Dnepr UK Ltd (Schoeggl, David) Modified on 6/26/2020 to add date of service (PM). (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#26

(#26) REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Volga-Dnepr UK Ltd, TO RESPONSE to #2 MOTION to Seal Complaint, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, and Supporting Documents (Schoeggl, David) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

#25

(#25) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Boeing Company (Schneider, Harry) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#24

(#24) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Volga-Dnepr UK Ltd (Schoeggl, David) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#23

(#23) RESPONSE, by Defendant The Boeing Company, to #2 MOTION to Seal Complaint, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, and Supporting Documents. (Schneider, Harry) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#8) UNREDACTED SEALED #6 Declaration, #2 MOTION to Seal Complaint, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, and Supporting Documents, #4 Redacted MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , by Plaintiff Volga-Dnepr UK Ltd (Schoeggl, David) Modified on 7/16/2020 to unseal per #28 Order (LH). (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#5

(#7) UNREDACTED SEALED #5 Declaration, #2 MOTION to Seal Complaint, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, and Supporting Documents, #4 Redacted MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , by Plaintiff Volga-Dnepr UK Ltd (Schoeggl, David) Modified on 7/16/2020 to unseal per #28 Order (LH). (Entered: 05/27/2020)

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#9) UNREDACTED SEALED #2 MOTION to Seal Complaint, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, and Supporting Documents, #4 Redacted MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , by Plaintiff Volga-Dnepr UK Ltd (Schoeggl, David) Modified on 7/16/2020 to unseal per #28 Order (LH). (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#23) RESPONSE, by Defendant The Boeing Company, to #2 MOTION to Seal Complaint, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, and Supporting Documents. (Schneider, Harry) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • Docket(#31) ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Length of Trial: *5-8 days*. Jury Trial is set for 3/14/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joinder of Parties due by 11/13/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 11/13/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/15/2021, Motions due by 10/15/2021, Discovery completed by 11/15/2021, Dispositive motions due by 12/14/2021, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 1/28/2022, Motions in Limine due by 2/14/2022, Pretrial Order due by 3/2/2022, Trial briefs to be submitted by 3/9/2022, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 3/9/2022.. (LC) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 5-8. (Schoeggl, David) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stephania Camp Denton on behalf of Plaintiff Volga-Dnepr UK Ltd. (Denton, Stephania) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Pursuant to the joint request of counsel, the Court finds good cause to continue the Joint Status Report deadline to 7/21/2020. (LC) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER denying Plaintiff's #2 Motion to seal documents and statements filed in connection with its complaint and motion for temporary restraining order. The CLERK SHALL UNSEAL Dkts. #3 , #7 , #8 , and #9 no earlier than ten (10) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) DECLARATION of Process Server of Service upon The Boeing Company; served on 5/29/2020, by Plaintiff Volga-Dnepr UK Ltd (Schoeggl, David) Modified on 6/26/2020 to add date of service (PM). (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Volga-Dnepr UK Ltd, TO RESPONSE to #2 MOTION to Seal Complaint, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, and Supporting Documents (Schoeggl, David) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Boeing Company (Schneider, Harry) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Volga-Dnepr UK Ltd (Schoeggl, David) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RESPONSE, by Defendant The Boeing Company, to #2 MOTION to Seal Complaint, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, and Supporting Documents. (Schneider, Harry) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REDACTION to #3 Sealed Unredacted Document, Complaint for Specific Performance, Damages, and Injunctive Relief by Plaintiff Volga-Dnepr UK Ltd (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons The Boeing Company, #3 Summons Boeing Commercial Airplanes)(Schoeggl, David) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #3 Sealed Unredacted Document, : Amended docket text to correctly identify the Unredacted Complaint as the document filed. (PS) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) UNREDACTED SEALED #2 MOTION to Seal Complaint, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, and Supporting Documents, #4 Redacted MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , by Plaintiff Volga-Dnepr UK Ltd (Schoeggl, David) Modified on 7/16/2020 to unseal per #28 Order (LH). (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) UNREDACTED SEALED #6 Declaration, #2 MOTION to Seal Complaint, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, and Supporting Documents, #4 Redacted MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , by Plaintiff Volga-Dnepr UK Ltd (Schoeggl, David) Modified on 7/16/2020 to unseal per #28 Order (LH). (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) UNREDACTED SEALED #5 Declaration, #2 MOTION to Seal Complaint, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, and Supporting Documents, #4 Redacted MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , by Plaintiff Volga-Dnepr UK Ltd (Schoeggl, David) Modified on 7/16/2020 to unseal per #28 Order (LH). (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Redacted DECLARATION of David M. Schoeggl re Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Volga-Dnepr UK Ltd re #2 MOTION to Seal Complaint, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, and Supporting Documents, #4 Redacted MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Schoeggl, David) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Redacted DECLARATION of Tatiana Arslanova re Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Volga-Dnepr UK Ltd re #2 MOTION to Seal Complaint, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, and Supporting Documents, #4 Redacted MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Schoeggl, David) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Redacted MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiff Volga-Dnepr UK Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/27/2020, (Schoeggl, David) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) UNREDACTED SEALED #2 MOTION to Seal Complaint, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, and Supporting Documents, COMPLAINT 1 by Plaintiff Volga-Dnepr UK Ltd (Schoeggl, David) Modified on 5/27/2020 (PS). Modified on 7/16/2020 to unseal per #28 Order (LH). (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Seal Complaint, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, and Supporting Documents, filed by Plaintiff Volga-Dnepr UK Ltd. Noting Date 5/27/2020, (Schoeggl, David) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less