This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/01/2022 at 09:51:36 (UTC).

VOKES v. O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/02/2022 VOKES filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Christy Criswell Wiegand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01124

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christy Criswell Wiegand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL VOKES

Defendant

O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES, LLC doing business as OREILLY AUTO PARTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sammy Sugiura

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony David Dick

Raeann Burgo

Robert E. Dezort

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES, LLC (kss) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jmm) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 8/3/2022. (jmm) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by MICHAEL VOKES. O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES, LLC served on 8/8/2022, answer due 8/29/2022. (Ward, Joshua) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#7

(#7) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint by O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES, LLC. Answer due from O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES, LLC on 10/13/2022. (Burgo, Raeann) Modified on 8/29/2022 to add document linkage. (kss) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Anthony D. Dick in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Ha

8 #2

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing

8 #3

Proposed Order Proposed Order Permitting Anthony D. Dick to Appear Pro Hac Vice

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Affidavit of Robert E. Dezort in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice

9 #2

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Raeann Burgo on behalf of O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES, LLC. (Burgo, Raeann) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Robert E. Dezort to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 9/1/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Anthony D. Dick to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 9/1/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for attorney Robert E. Dezort to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7272012) by O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Robert E. Dezort in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Permitting Robert E. Dezort to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Defendant) (Dezort, Robert) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for attorney Anthony D. Dick to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7271953) by O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Anthony D. Dick in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Permitting Anthony D. Dick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Defendant) (Dick, Anthony) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint by O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES, LLC. Answer due from O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES, LLC on 10/13/2022. (Burgo, Raeann) Modified on 8/29/2022 to add document linkage. (kss) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by MICHAEL VOKES. O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES, LLC served on 8/8/2022, answer due 8/29/2022. (Ward, Joshua) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jmm) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 8/3/2022. (jmm) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jmm) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES, LLC (kss) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against OREILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7224877), filed by MICHAEL VOKES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kss) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less