This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2022 at 08:20:27 (UTC).

VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 VOIP-PAL COM, INC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Meta Platforms, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Scott Corley, Nathanael M. Cousins and James Donato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-03202

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jacqueline Scott Corley

Nathanael M. Cousins

James Donato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Voip-Pal.com, Inc.

Defendants

Meta Platforms, Inc.

WhatsApp Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lewis Emery Hudnell, III

Attorney at Hudnell Law Group PC

800 W. El Camino Real, Suite 180

Mountain View, CA 94040

Sean Franklin Parmenter

Attorney at Parmenter Intellectual Property Law PLLC

8980 N Pine Hollow Dr

Cedar Hills, UT 84062-0033

Nicolas Spiros Gikkas

Attorney at The Gikkas Law Firm, P.C.

530 Lytton Avenue, 2Nd Floor

Palo Alto, CA 94301

Lewis E Hudnell, III

Attorney at Hudnell Law Group PC

800 W. El Camino Real, Suite 180

Mountain View, CA 94040

Defendant Attorneys

Kristina R. Cary

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

200 Clarendon Street

Boston, MA 02116

Joshua P. Glucoft

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 3700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Joshua Popik Glucoft

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

2049 Century Park E, Ste. 3700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Karl Richard Hanson

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 N Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

Michael E. Jones

Attorney at Potter Minton PC

110 N College, Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

Sam Santopoalo

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

2049 Century Park East, 37Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Ellisen S. Turner

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 3700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Shaun William Hassett

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

2000 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1400

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#79

(#79) ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #78 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kristina R Cary. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2022) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

78 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

78 #78

Main Document

#77

(#77) ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #76 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Karl Hanson. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2022) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

76 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

76 #76

Main Document

#75

(#75) NOTICE of Appearance by Sam Santopoalo for Meta Platforms, Inc. and WhatsApp LLC (Santopoalo, Sam) (Filed on 7/7/2022) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#74

(#74) Case Reassigned to Judge James Donato. Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2022) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#73

(#73) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Meta Platforms, Inc., WhatsApp Inc. (Glucoft, Joshua) (Filed on 6/16/2022) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hudnell, Lewis) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Hudnell, Lewis) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Hudnell, Lewis) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

1 #5

Exhibit 4 to Complaint

1 #4

Exhibit 3 to Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit 2 to Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit 1 to Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

218 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #78 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kristina R Cary. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2022) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17344318.) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cary, Kristina) (Filed on 7/12/2022) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #76 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Karl Hanson. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2022) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Karl Hanson ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17331789.) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., WhatsApp Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hanson, Karl) (Filed on 7/7/2022) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) NOTICE of Appearance by Sam Santopoalo for Meta Platforms, Inc. and WhatsApp LLC (Santopoalo, Sam) (Filed on 7/7/2022) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) Case Reassigned to Judge James Donato. Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2022) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Meta Platforms, Inc., WhatsApp Inc. (Glucoft, Joshua) (Filed on 6/16/2022) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/25/2022. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 9/1/2022 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Adv anced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than by noon on 8/31/2022.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2022 ) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 6/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2022) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • Docket(#70) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2022) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. as to Facebook, Inc.. Waiver sent on 7/1/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (Hudnell, Lewis) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicolas Spiros Gikkas on behalf of VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. (Gikkas, Nicolas) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to WHATSAPP, INC.. (lad) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hudnell, Lewis) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Hudnell, Lewis) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Hudnell, Lewis) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14956243), filed by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit 4 to Complaint)(Hudnell, Lewis) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WhatsApp Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristina R. Cary