This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/21/2023 at 17:55:01 (UTC).

VOIP-PAL.com Inc v. Huawei Technologies Co LTD et al

Case Summary

On 01/20/2023 VOIP-PAL com Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Huawei Technologies Co LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Brantley Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00151

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brantley Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VOIP-PAL.com Inc

Defendants

Huawei Device Co Ltd

Huawei Technologies Co Ltd

Huawei Technologies USA Inc

Huawei Device (Dongguan) Co.

Huawei Device (Shenzhen) Co Ltd

Huawei Device USA Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicolas Spiros Gikkas

Lewis E. Hudnell, III

Defendant Attorneys

Robert R. Laurenzi

Jason W Cook

Cole D. Malmberg

John A. Cotiguala

Matthew William Cornelia

Matthew Lind

Matthias Andreas Kamber

Robert W. Unikel

Ariell Bratton

Grayson S. Cornwell

 

Court Documents

#67

(#67) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (axm) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

#66

(#66) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (acm) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

65 #1

*Restricted*

#65

(#65) Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:21-cv-01247. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 01/20/2023)

#64

RESTRICTED

#63

(#63) TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. for proceedings held on 12/21/2022. Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter: Matthew Cornelia. (Hudnell, Lewis) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/20/2023.] (Entered: 01/06/2023)

#62

RESTRICTED

#61

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#60

(#60) TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Huawei Device (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd., Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD, Huawei Technologies USA Inc. for proceedings held on 12/21/2022. Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter: FTR. (Cornelia, Matthew) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/20/2023.] (Entered: 12/27/2022)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Hudnell, Lewis) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/20/2023.] (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hudnell, Lewis) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/1/2021) (lad). [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/20/2023.] (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#2

(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Hudnell, Lewis) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/20/2023.] (Entered: 11/30/2021)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15486483), filed by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hudnell, Lewis) (Attachment 5 replaced on 12/1/2021) (lad). [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/20/2023.] (Entered: 11/30/2021)

95 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (axm) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (acm) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:21-cv-01247. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) Sealed Order. Parties are to submit a redacted version, in word format, of this order within 7 days to the Court's Law Clerks at txwdml_nojudge_chambers_wa_judgegilliland@txwd.uscourts.gov. If redacted version is not received, the document will otherwise become public. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (sm3) Modified on 1/20/2023 (sm3). [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/20/2023.] (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. for proceedings held on 12/21/2022. Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter: Matthew Cornelia. (Hudnell, Lewis) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/20/2023.] (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Derek T. Gilliland: Markman Hearing held on 1/4/2023 by Zoom. Written Order will be forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(sm3) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/20/2023.] (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) Sealed Transcript filed (This transcript is not available electronically) (ta) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/20/2023.] (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Huawei Device (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd., Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., LTD, Huawei Technologies USA Inc. for proceedings held on 12/21/2022. Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter: FTR. (Cornelia, Matthew) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/20/2023.] (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Derek T. Gilliland: Sealed Motion Hearing held by Zoom on 12/21/2022. Parties announced ready. Statements and arguments of counsel heard. Defendants' Sealed Opposed Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue (Doc. 25) is GRANTED as outlined during the hearing on the record. Defendants' counsel to submit a proposed order in word format to the Court's Law Clerk at Mark_Scott@txwd.uscourts.gov by Friday,December 30th. Written Order to follow. Hearing concluded. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR.)(sm3) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/20/2023.] (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) ORDER Setting Zoom Markman Hearing for 1/4/2023 02:00 PM before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (bot1) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/20/2023.] (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. Huawei Technologies USA Inc. served on 12/9/2021, answer due 12/30/2021. (Hudnell, Lewis) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/20/2023.] (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicolas Spiros Gikkas on behalf of VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. (Gikkas, Nicolas) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/20/2023.] (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/20/2023.] (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Huawei Technologies USA Inc.. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/20/2023.] (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Huawei Technologies Co., LTD. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/20/2023.] (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/20/2023.] (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Hudnell, Lewis) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/20/2023.] (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hudnell, Lewis) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/1/2021) (lad). [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/20/2023.] (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Hudnell, Lewis) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/20/2023.] (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15486483), filed by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hudnell, Lewis) (Attachment 5 replaced on 12/1/2021) (lad). [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/20/2023.] (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less