This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/29/2022 at 06:25:06 (UTC).

Vogt v. K&B Auto Sales LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 Vogt filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against K B Auto Sales LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen R. Clark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00385

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen R. Clark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lillian Louise Morgan Vogt

Defendants

K&B Auto Sales LLC

Progressive Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin M. Carnie

Attorney at SIMON LAW FIRM PC

800 Market Street, Suite 1700

St. Louis, MO 63101

Patrick Ryan McPhail

Attorney at THE SIMON LAW FIRM PC

800 Market Street, Suite 1700

St. Louis, MO 63101

Patrick J. Boyle

Attorney at GUNN AND GUNN

11901 Olive Boulevard, Suite 312, P.O. Box 419002

St. Louis, MO 63141-6736

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin D. Wayman

Attorney at KEVIN D WAYMAN ATTORNEY AT LAW LLC

2333 South Hanley Rd.

Brentwood, MO 63144

Jennifer L. Mesko

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS LLP - Cleveland

950 Main Ave., Suite 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113

Kelly Ann Baldini

416 Ridgemont Rd

Collinsville, IL 62234

Sandra Jane Wunderlich

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS LLP - St Louis

100 S. 4Th Street, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63102

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) SUPPLEMENTAL re #32 Supplemental Plaintiff's Response to Progressive's Supplemental Brief in Support of Jurisdiction by Plaintiff Lillian Louise Morgan Vogt. (Carnie, Kevin) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

32 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Michael Silver

32 #32

Main Document

#30

(#30) REPORT TO COURT ORDER re #29 Case Management Order,, Joint Jurisdictional Report by Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Mesko, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

#29

(#29) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case is assigned to Track: 3. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Motion to Join Parties due by 12/1/2022. Discovery Completion due by 10/16/2023. ADR Future Reference 1/16/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 12/22/2023. Jury Trial set for 4/22/2024 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14N - St. Louis before District Judge Stephen R. Clark. Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2024 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14N - St. Louis before District Judge Stephen R. Clark. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 10/13/2022. (CLT) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#26

(#26) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Excuse Lead Counsel from Attending Rule 16 Conference by Plaintiff Lillian Louise Morgan Vogt. (McPhail, Patrick) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#25

(#25) JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Lillian Louise Morgan Vogt. Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan. (McPhail, Patrick) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#24

(#24) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pursuant to the Civil Justice Reform Act Expense and Delay Reduction Plan and the Differentiated Case Management Program of the United States District Court of the Eastern District of Missouri, the Court orders the following schedule: SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. This case is assigned to Track: 2. (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/23/2022. Rule 16 Conference set for 10/4/2022 04:40 PM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Stephen R. Clark.) Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 9/9/2022. (CLT) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company Sent To: State Court - Executed (Wunderlich, Sandra) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#5

(#5) First Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St Louis, filed by Lillian Louise Morgan Vogt.(BAK) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#4

(#4) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St Louis, filed by Lillian Louise Morgan Vogt.(BAK) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. Parent companies: Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc.; The Progressive Corporation, Subsidiaries: n/a, Publicly held company: n/a,. (Wunderlich, Sandra) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Wunderlich, Sandra) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Original Filing Form

1 #2

Attachment Pending Motion in State Court Action

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court File

1 #1

Main Document

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) SUPPLEMENTAL re #32 Supplemental Plaintiff's Response to Progressive's Supplemental Brief in Support of Jurisdiction by Plaintiff Lillian Louise Morgan Vogt. (Carnie, Kevin) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) SUPPLEMENTAL re 31 Docket Text Order with Schedules, Brief In Support Jurisdiction by Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Silver)(Mesko, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Docket Text ORDER: Having considered the parties' #30 Joint Jurisdictional Report, the Court adopts the parties' proposed supplemental briefing schedule. Progressive must file its supplemental brief on jurisdiction by no later than November 2, 2022, and Vogt must file its response by no later than November 9, 2022. (Response to Court due by 11/2/2022.) Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 10/26/2022. (CLT) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) REPORT TO COURT ORDER re #29 Case Management Order,, Joint Jurisdictional Report by Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Mesko, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case is assigned to Track: 3. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Motion to Join Parties due by 12/1/2022. Discovery Completion due by 10/16/2023. ADR Future Reference 1/16/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 12/22/2023. Jury Trial set for 4/22/2024 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14N - St. Louis before District Judge Stephen R. Clark. Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2024 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14N - St. Louis before District Judge Stephen R. Clark. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 10/13/2022. (CLT) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • Docket(#28) ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Stephen R. Clark: Rule 16 Conference held on 10/12/2022 via Zoom Teleconference. CMO to issue. (Notice only, no.pdf attached) (proceedings started: 4:02 p.m.) (proceedings ended: 4:46 p.m.) (Appearance for Plaintiff: Kevin Carnie, Patrick McPhail) (Appearance for Defendant: Jennifer Mesko, Kelly Baldini, Sandra Wunderlich). (CLT) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Docket Text ORDER: The Court grants, in the alternative, Plaintiffs #26 Unopposed Motion. The Court continues the Rule 16 conference to October 12, 2022 at 4:00 p.m. CT by Zoom. Conference participants will receive an email with a link to access the conference. Lead trial counsel must participate in the conference. (Rule 16 Conference set for 10/12/2022 04:00 PM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Stephen R. Clark.) Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 9/26/22. (JAB) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Excuse Lead Counsel from Attending Rule 16 Conference by Plaintiff Lillian Louise Morgan Vogt. (McPhail, Patrick) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Lillian Louise Morgan Vogt. Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan. (McPhail, Patrick) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pursuant to the Civil Justice Reform Act Expense and Delay Reduction Plan and the Differentiated Case Management Program of the United States District Court of the Eastern District of Missouri, the Court orders the following schedule: SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. This case is assigned to Track: 2. (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/23/2022. Rule 16 Conference set for 10/4/2022 04:40 PM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Stephen R. Clark.) Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 9/9/2022. (CLT) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant K&B Auto Sales LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Wayman, Kevin) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCase Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen R. Clark. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (BAK) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition for Failure to State A Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted and alternative, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant K&B Auto Sales LLC. (BAK) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Second Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St Louis, filed by Lillian Louise Morgan Vogt.(BAK) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company Sent To: State Court - Executed (Wunderlich, Sandra) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St Louis, filed by Lillian Louise Morgan Vogt.(BAK) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St Louis, filed by Lillian Louise Morgan Vogt.(BAK) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. Parent companies: Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc.; The Progressive Corporation, Subsidiaries: n/a, Publicly held company: n/a,. (Wunderlich, Sandra) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Wunderlich, Sandra) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21st Judicial Circuit, St. Louis County, Missouri, case number 21SL-AC01922, with receipt number AMOEDC-9217718, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Attachment Pending Motion in State Court Action, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wunderlich, Sandra) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where K&B AUTO SALES is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sandra J. Wunderlich

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer L. Mesko