This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/03/2022 at 07:14:10 (UTC).

Vogel v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2021 Vogel filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Broomes and Angel D. Mitchell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02511

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Broomes

Referral Judge

Angel D. Mitchell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carrie Vogel

Defendants

Johnson & Johnson

Ethicon, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathaniel Scearcy

Attorney at The Potts Law Firm, LLP

1901 West 47Th Place, Suite 210

Westwood, KS 66205

Timothy L. Sifers

Attorney at The Potts Law Firm, LLP

1901 West 47Th Place, Suite 210

Westwood, KS 66205

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5628102.), filed by Carrie Vogel.(Sifers, Timothy) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Carrie Vogel. (Sifers, Timothy) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff must show cause in writing by November 19, 2021, why the court should not recommend that the district judge dismiss this case for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/5/21. (kks) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Carrie Vogel.(Sifers, Timothy) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#5

(#5) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Nathaniel Scearcy on behalf of Carrie Vogel. (Scearcy, Nathaniel) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#6

(#6) RESPONSE re #3 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff Carrie Vogel(Scearcy, Nathaniel) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Regarding #6 Plaintiff's Response to the Show-Cause Order. The court previously ordered plaintiff to show cause why the magistrate judge should not recommend that this case be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction because the complaint did not establish diversity of citizenship. Plaintiff's response to the show-cause order and newly filed amended complaint now adequately allege plaintiff's own citizenship. As such, plaintiff has pleaded facts sufficient to establish diversity jurisdiction, and therefore the court will not recommend dismissal for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/22/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(bh) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE re #3 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff Carrie Vogel(Scearcy, Nathaniel) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Nathaniel Scearcy on behalf of Carrie Vogel. (Scearcy, Nathaniel) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Carrie Vogel.(Sifers, Timothy) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff must show cause in writing by November 19, 2021, why the court should not recommend that the district judge dismiss this case for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/5/21. (kks) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Carrie Vogel. (Sifers, Timothy) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5628102.), filed by Carrie Vogel.(Sifers, Timothy) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy L. Sifers

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathaniel Scearcy