This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2021 at 10:22:21 (UTC).

Vocalife LLC v. Bose Corporation

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 Vocalife LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Bose Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00128

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vocalife LLC

Defendant

Bose Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alfred Ross Fabricant

Attorney at Fabricant LLP - NY

230 Park Avenue, 3Rd Floor W.

New York, NY 10169

Peter Lambrianakos

Attorney at Fabricant LLP - NY

230 Park Avenue, 3Rd Floor W.

New York, NY 10169

Vincent J Rubino, III

Attorney at Fabricant LLP - NY

230 Park Avenue, 3Rd Floor W.

New York, NY 10169

Enrique William Iturralde

Attorney at Fabricant LLP - NY

230 Park Avenue, 3Rd Floor W.

New York, NY 10169

Jennifer Leigh Truelove

Attorney at McKool Smith, P.C. - Marshall

104 East Houston St, Suite 300

Marshall, TX 75670

Samuel Franklin Baxter

Attorney at McKool Smith, P.C. - Marshall

104 East Houston St, Suite 300

Marshall, TX 75670

Justine Minseon Park

Attorney at Fabricant LLP - NY

230 Park Avenue, 3Rd Floor W.

New York, NY 10169

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No 8,861,756

1 #2

Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No RE47,049

1 #3

Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No RE48,371

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Leigh Truelove on behalf of Vocalife LLC (Truelove, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Franklin Baxter on behalf of Vocalife LLC (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justine Minseon Park on behalf of Vocalife LLC (Park, Justine) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Enrique William Iturralde on behalf of Vocalife LLC (Iturralde, Enrique) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Issued as to Bose Corporation. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent J Rubino, III on behalf of Vocalife LLC (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Lambrianakos on behalf of Vocalife LLC (Lambrianakos, Peter) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alfred Ross Fabricant on behalf of Vocalife LLC (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Vocalife LLC identifying Corporate Parent Algovate Inc. for Vocalife LLC. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Bose Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8346864.), filed by Vocalife LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No 8,861,756, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No RE47,049, #3 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No RE48,371, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vocalife LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BOSE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Enrique William Iturralde