This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/04/2020 at 18:54:52 (UTC).

Vocalife LLC v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/16/2019 Vocalife LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Amazon com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00123

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Vocalife LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Amazon.com LLC

Amazon.com, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Donald E Tiller

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Lawrence Chester Drucker

Attorney at Brown Rudnick, LLP - New York

Seven Times Square 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Justine Minseon Park

Attorney at Brown Rudnick LLP - NY

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Samuel Franklin Baxter

Attorney at McKool Smith - Marshall

P O Box O, 104 East Houston St., Suite 300

Marshall, TX 75670

Alfred Ross Fabricant

Attorney at Brown Rudnick, LLP - New York

Seven Times Square 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Vincent J Rubino, III

Attorney at Brown Rudnick, LLP - New York

Seven Times Square 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Jennifer Leigh Truelove

Attorney at McKool Smith - Marshall

P O Box O, 104 East Houston St., Suite 300

Marshall, TX 75670

Enrique William Iturralde

Attorney at Brown Rudnick, LLP - New York

Seven Times Square 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Alessandra Carcaterra Messing

Attorney at Brown Rudnick, LLP - New York

Seven Times Square 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jennifer Haltom Doan

Attorney at Haltom & Doan

6500 Summerhill Road, Crown Executive Center Suite 100

Texarkana, TX 75503

Kyle Randall Akin

Attorney at Haltom & Doan

6500 Summerhill Road, Crown Executive Center Suite 100

Texarkana, TX 75503

Joseph R. Re

Attorney at Knobbe Martens Olson & Bear LLP - Irvine

2040 Main St, Fourteenth Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Colin B. Heideman

Attorney at Knobbe Martens Olson & Bear LLP - Seattle

925 Fourth Avenue, Suite 2500

Seattle, WA 98104

Jeremy A. Anapol

Attorney at Knobbe Martens Olson & Bear LLP - Irvine

2040 Main St, Fourteenth Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Joseph S Cianfrani

Attorney at Knobbe Martens Olson & Bear LLP - Irvine

2040 Main St, Fourteenth Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Kendall M. Loebbaka

Attorney at Knobbe Martens Olson & Bear LLP - Irvine

2040 Main St, Fourteenth Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

#67

66 #2

Exhibit B - Amazon's Proposed Claim Constructions and Evidence

66 #1

Exhibit A - Vocalife LLC's Proposed Constructions

#66

#65

#64

63 #1

Text of Proposed Order Amended Docket Control Order

#63

#62

4 #1

Summons(es)

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

167 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) ORDER - Court hereby appoints Mr. Donald Tiller as the Courts technical advisor in this case. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/28/2020. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) Joint P.R. 4-3 Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Vocalife LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Vocalife LLC's Proposed Constructions, #2 Exhibit B - Amazon's Proposed Claim Constructions and Evidence)(Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Enrique William Iturralde on behalf of Vocalife LLC (Iturralde, Enrique) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER granting #63 Joint MOTION for Entry of Amended Docket Control Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/6/2019. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) Joint MOTION for Entry of Amended Docket Control Order by Vocalife LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Amended Docket Control Order)(Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 01/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) E-DISCOVERY ORDER granting #61 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed E-Discovery Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/31/2019. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed E-Discovery Order by Vocalife LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed E-Discovery Order)(Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) NOTICE by Vocalife LLC of Compliance Pursuant to Patent Rule 4-2 (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Amazon.com LLC, Amazon.com, Inc. in Compliance with Patent Rule 4-2 (Cianfrani, Joseph) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) ORDER granting #22 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Amazon's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/27/2019. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justine Minseon Park on behalf of Vocalife LLC (Park, Justine) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent J Rubino, III on behalf of Vocalife LLC (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence Chester Drucker on behalf of Vocalife LLC (Drucker, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alfred Ross Fabricant on behalf of Vocalife LLC (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Amazon.com LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.., Summons Issued as to Amazon.com LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Vocalife LLC identifying Corporate Parent Algovate Inc. for Vocalife LLC. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Amazon.com LLC, Amazon.com, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7228386.), filed by Vocalife LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vocalife LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justine Minseon Park

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lawrence Chester Drucker