This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 07:28:56 (UTC).

VNK MANAGEMENT, LLC et al v. Parker

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 VNK MANAGEMENT, LLC filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Parker. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan van Keulen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-04799

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan van Keulen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vinod Khosla

VNK MANAGEMENT, LLC

Defendant

Jeffrey Parker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jordan T. Smith

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Christopher William Johnstone

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

2600 El Camino Real, Suite 400

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Nicholas Purcell

Attorney at WilmerHale

350 S Grand Ave, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorney

Henry Adam Platt

Attorney at Saul Ewing LLP

1919 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 550

Washington, DC 20006-3434

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher William Johnstone (Johnstone, Christopher) (Filed on 9/8/2020) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#14

(#14) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) filed byVinod Khosla, VNK MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Johnstone, Christopher) (Filed on 8/28/2020) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Purcell (Purcell, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/28/2020) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER GRANTING #11 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND PLAINTIFFS' TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 08/04/2020. Plaintiffs' opposition is due 8/28. Defendant's reply is due 9/18. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

11 #1

Declaration of Chris Johnstone in Support

#11

(#11) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Time to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Vinod Khosla, VNK MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chris Johnstone in Support)(Johnstone, Christopher) (Filed on 8/4/2020) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#10

(#10) Certificate of Interested Entities by Vinod Khosla, VNK MANAGEMENT, LLC (and Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Johnstone, Christopher) (Filed on 7/31/2020) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#9

(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Vinod Khosla, VNK MANAGEMENT, LLC.. (Johnstone, Christopher) (Filed on 7/31/2020) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher William Johnstone (Johnstone, Christopher) (Filed on 7/31/2020) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Jeffrey Parker of Certificate of Service by Email of ECF Nos. 4, 5 & 6 (Platt, Henry) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

6 #5

Proposed Order

6 #4

Exhibit C

6 #3

Exhibit B

6 #2

Exhibit A

6 #1

Declaration of Jeffrey Parker in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Jeffrey Parker. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Responses due by 8/7/2020. Replies due by 8/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Parker in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Platt, Henry) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interested Entities by Jeffrey Parker (Platt, Henry) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#4

(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jeffrey Parker.. (Platt, Henry) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher William Johnstone (Johnstone, Christopher) (Filed on 9/8/2020) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) filed byVinod Khosla, VNK MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Johnstone, Christopher) (Filed on 8/28/2020) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Purcell (Purcell, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/28/2020) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER GRANTING #11 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND PLAINTIFFS' TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 08/04/2020. Plaintiffs' opposition is due 8/28. Defendant's reply is due 9/18. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Time to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Vinod Khosla, VNK MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chris Johnstone in Support)(Johnstone, Christopher) (Filed on 8/4/2020) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Certificate of Interested Entities by Vinod Khosla, VNK MANAGEMENT, LLC (and Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Johnstone, Christopher) (Filed on 7/31/2020) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Vinod Khosla, VNK MANAGEMENT, LLC.. (Johnstone, Christopher) (Filed on 7/31/2020) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher William Johnstone (Johnstone, Christopher) (Filed on 7/31/2020) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Jeffrey Parker of Certificate of Service by Email of ECF Nos. 4, 5 & 6 (Platt, Henry) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Jeffrey Parker. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Responses due by 8/7/2020. Replies due by 8/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Parker in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Platt, Henry) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Entities by Jeffrey Parker (Platt, Henry) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jeffrey Parker.. (Platt, Henry) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/31/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 20CV366303. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14705547). Filed byJeffrey Parker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Platt, Henry) (Filed on 7/17/2020) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less