This case was last updated from PACER on 12/19/2020 at 08:48:25 (UTC).

VMS Software, Inc. v. Sysorex, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 VMS Software, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sysorex, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is William G. Young. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-11895

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William G. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VMS Software, Inc.

Defendants

Sysorex, Inc. s/b/m Inpixon USA f/k/a Sysorex USA

Sysorex, Inc.

Sysorex USA

Trustee

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael R. Stanley

Attorney at Sheehan Phinney Bass & Green, PA

28 State Street, 22Nd Flr.

Boston, MA 02109

Aaron D. Rosenberg

Attorney at Sheehan Phinney Bass & Green, PA

28 State Street, 22Nd Flr.

Boston, MA 02109

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Cover Letter

#10

(#10) ANSWER of Trustee by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) Ex Parte AFFIDAVIT of Danielle Dickie in Support re #2 MOTION for Trustee Process Ex Parte filed by VMS Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

6 #2

Exhibit B

#6

(#6) Ex Parte MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Trustee Process Ex Parte filed by VMS Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Reissued as to Sysorex, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Paine, Matthew)Summons Reissued as Counsel Did Not Enter the Party Information Correctly for the Defendant (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Sysorex, Inc. s/b/m Inpixon USA f/k/a Sysorex USA. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

2 #4

Exhibit Sysorex 10-K Excerpts

2 #3

Exhibit Wells Fargo Website

2 #2

Affidavit Affidavit of Danielle DIckie

#2

(#2) MOTION for Trustee Process Ex Parte by VMS Software, Inc.. (Stanley, Michael) Modified on 10/21/2020 to Delete Attachments and Refile As Separate Docket Entries) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 10/20/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Settlement Agreement

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Sysorex, Inc. s/b/m Inpixon USA f/k/a Sysorex USA Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8472755 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by VMS Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Stanley, Michael) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron D. Rosenberg on behalf of VMS Software, Inc. (Rosenberg, Aaron) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed Sysorex, Inc. served on 12/7/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Rosenberg, Aaron) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER of Trustee by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS to Trustee Returned Executed Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 10/26/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Stanley, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #2 Ex Parte Motion for Trustee Process (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Ex Parte AFFIDAVIT of Danielle Dickie in Support re #2 MOTION for Trustee Process Ex Parte filed by VMS Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Ex Parte MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Trustee Process Ex Parte filed by VMS Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Reissued as to Sysorex, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Paine, Matthew)Summons Reissued as Counsel Did Not Enter the Party Information Correctly for the Defendant (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Sysorex, Inc. s/b/m Inpixon USA f/k/a Sysorex USA. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Trustee Process Ex Parte by VMS Software, Inc.. (Stanley, Michael) Modified on 10/21/2020 to Delete Attachments and Refile As Separate Docket Entries) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Sysorex, Inc. s/b/m Inpixon USA f/k/a Sysorex USA Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8472755 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by VMS Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Stanley, Michael) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less