This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/02/2021 at 07:34:10 (UTC).

Vladimir Maza Gonzalez v. Blackrock Logistics, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 Vladimir Maza Gonzalez filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Blackrock Logistics, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jesus G. Bernal and Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-01507

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jesus G. Bernal

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vladimir Maza Gonzalez

Defendants

Blackrock Logistics, Inc.

Deploy HR, Inc.

Vensure HR, Inc.

Denise Rivera

Olivier Simon

Nora Schild

Does 1 to 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Babak Termechi

Attorney at Termechi Employment Law Group

5900 Canoga Avenue Suite 380

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant Attorneys

Jannine E Kranz

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

2049 Century Park East 5Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3107

Bradley E. Schwan

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

2049 Century Park East 5Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case #11 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (twdb) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

11 #1

Proposed Order

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Babak Termechi counsel for Plaintiff Vladimir Maza Gonzalez. Caria Castro Rivas is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Jamell Howard. (Termechi, Babak) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Declaration of Bradley E. Schwan in Support of Defendants' Notice of Remova

1 #3

Exhibit C - Defendants' Answer

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Civil

1 #1

Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case #11 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (twdb) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by plaintiff Vladimir Maza Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Termechi, Babak) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Babak Termechi counsel for Plaintiff Vladimir Maza Gonzalez. Caria Castro Rivas is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Jamell Howard. (Termechi, Babak) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Blackrock Logistics, Inc., Deploy HR, Inc., Does, Denise Rivera, Nora Schild, Olivier Simon, Vensure HR, Inc.. (Schwan, Bradley) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (esa) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendants Blackrock Logistics, Inc., Deploy HR, Inc., Denise Rivera, Nora Schild, Olivier Simon, Vensure HR, Inc. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 3)(esa) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Vladimir Maza Gonzalez, upon Defendant Denise Rivera acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 7/19/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Mark Polland, Attorney. (submitted as document 1, attachment 2) (esa) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Blackrock Logistics, Inc., Deploy HR, Inc., Does, Denise Rivera, Nora Schild, Olivier Simon, Vensure HR, Inc., Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Vladimir Maza Gonzalez. (filed in state court 6/29/2021, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Blackrock Logistics, Inc., Deploy HR, Inc., Does, Denise Rivera, Nora Schild, Olivier Simon, Vensure HR, Inc. identifying Vensure Employer Service, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Schwan, Bradley) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying Blackrock Logistics, Inc., Deploy HR, Inc., Vensure HR, Inc., Vensure Employer Services, Inc., Denise Rivera, Olivier Simon, Nora Schilds, Larry James, and Vladimir Maza Gonzalez. (Schwan, Bradley) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino County Superior Court, case number CIVSB2118886 Receipt No: ACACDC-31928972 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Olivier Simon, Deploy HR, Inc., Nora Schild, Blackrock Logistics, Inc., Does, Vensure HR, Inc., Denise Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Civil, #3 Exhibit C - Defendants' Answer, #4 Declaration of Bradley E. Schwan in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal) (Attorney Bradley E. Schwan added to party Blackrock Logistics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley E. Schwan added to party Deploy HR, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley E. Schwan added to party Does(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley E. Schwan added to party Denise Rivera(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley E. Schwan added to party Nora Schild(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley E. Schwan added to party Olivier Simon(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley E. Schwan added to party Vensure HR, Inc.(pty:dft))(Schwan, Bradley) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less