This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/12/2021 at 10:15:32 (UTC).

Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust v. Kauffman et al

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Kauffman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nathaniel M. Gorton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-12213

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nathaniel M. Gorton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trsut

Defendants

Michael G Kauffman

Deepika R Pakianathan

Barry E Greene

Mansoor Raza Mirza

Michael F Falvey

Kenneth E Weg

J. Scott Garland

Justin A Renz

Sharon Shacham

Mikael Dolsten

Garen G Bohlin

Karyopharm Therapeutics Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph P. Calandrelli

Attorney at O'Connor, Carnathan and Mack LLC

1 Van De Graaff Drive, Suite 104

Burlington, MA 01803

Benjamin I Sachs-Michaels

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

712 Fifth Avenue, 31St Flr.

New York, NY 10019

Defendant Attorneys

Michael G. Bongiorno

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

7 World Trade Center, 250 Greenwich Street

New York, NY 10007

Allyson T. Slater

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP (Bos)

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

6 #10

Weg

6 #9

Renz

6 #8

Pakianathan

6 #7

Mirza

6 #4

Garland

6 #3

Falvey

6 #2

Dohlston

6 #1

Bohlin

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered: Please See Attached Order re #13 Joint MOTION to Stay Action Pending Further Proceedings in Related Securities Class Action filed by J. Scott Garland, Deepika R Pakianathan, Barry E Greene, Michael G Kauffman, Garen G Bohlin, Michael F Falvey, Karyopharm Therapeutics Inc., Mansoor Raza Mirza, Mikael Dolsten, Kenneth E Weg, Justin A Renz, Sharon Shacham (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered: ALLOWING #13 Motion to Stay. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint MOTION to Stay Action Pending Further Proceedings in Related Securities Class Action by Garen G Bohlin, Mikael Dolsten, Michael F Falvey, J. Scott Garland, Barry E Greene, Karyopharm Therapeutics Inc., Michael G Kauffman, Mansoor Raza Mirza, Deepika R Pakianathan, Justin A Renz, Sharon Shacham, Kenneth E Weg. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bongiorno, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Karyopharm Therapeutics Inc.. (Bongiorno, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Allyson T. Slater on behalf of Karyopharm Therapeutics Inc. (Slater, Allyson) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Bongiorno on behalf of Karyopharm Therapeutics Inc. (Bongiorno, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Karyopharm Therapeutics Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Allyson T. Slater on behalf of Garen G Bohlin, Mikael Dolsten, Michael F Falvey, J. Scott Garland, Barry E Greene, Michael G Kauffman, Mansoor Raza Mirza, Deepika R Pakianathan, Justin A Renz, Sharon Shacham, Kenneth E Weg (Slater, Allyson) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Bongiorno on behalf of Garen G Bohlin, Mikael Dolsten, Michael F Falvey, J. Scott Garland, Barry E Greene, Michael G Kauffman, Mansoor Raza Mirza, Deepika R Pakianathan, Justin A Renz, Sharon Shacham, Kenneth E Weg (Bongiorno, Michael) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trsut. Garen G Bohlin waiver sent on 12/21/2020, answer due 2/19/2021; Mikael Dolsten waiver sent on 12/21/2020, answer due 2/19/2021; Michael F Falvey waiver sent on 12/21/2020, answer due 2/19/2021; J. Scott Garland waiver sent on 12/21/2020, answer due 2/19/2021; Barry E Greene waiver sent on 12/21/2020, answer due 2/19/2021; Michael G Kauffman waiver sent on 12/21/2020, answer due 2/19/2021; Mansoor Raza Mirza waiver sent on 12/21/2020, answer due 2/19/2021; Deepika R Pakianathan waiver sent on 12/21/2020, answer due 2/19/2021; Justin A Renz waiver sent on 12/21/2020, answer due 2/19/2021; Sharon Shacham waiver sent on 12/21/2020, answer due 2/19/2021; Kenneth E Weg waiver sent on 12/21/2020, answer due 2/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Bohlin, #2 Dohlston, #3 Falvey, #4 Garland, #5 Greene, #6 KaryPharm, #7 Mirza, #8 Pakianathan, #9 Renz, #10 Weg, #11 Schachman)(Sachs-Michaels, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: ALLOWING #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Benjamin I. Sachs-Michaels. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Benjamin I. Sachs-Michaels Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8553679 by Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trsut.(Calandrelli, Joseph) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8551996 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust, Derivatively and on Behalf of Karyopham Therapeutics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Calandrelli, Joseph) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph P. Calandrelli

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Sachs-Michaels