This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 09:55:17 (UTC).

Vivint v. Alert Holdings Group

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 Vivint filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Alert Holdings Group. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Evelyn J. Furse and Clark Waddoups. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00215

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Evelyn J. Furse

Clark Waddoups

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vivint

Defendant

Alert Holdings Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mitchell A. Stephens

Attorney at HATCH JAMES & DODGE

10 W Broadway Ste 400

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Mark F James

Attorney at HATCH JAMES & DODGE

10 W Broadway Ste 400

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Justin L. James

Attorney at HATCH JAMES & DODGE PC

10 W Broadway Ste 400

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Defendant Attorneys

Ruth A. Shapiro

Attorney at SNOW CHRISTENSEN & MARTINEAU

10 Exchange Place 11Th Fl, Po Box 45000

Salt Lake City, UT 84145-5000

Stephen Dayn Kelson

Attorney at CHRISTENSEN & JENSEN PC

257 E 200 S Ste 1100

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Jeremy S. Stuart

Attorney at SNOW CHRISTENSEN & MARTINEAU

10 Exchange Place 11Th Fl, Po Box 45000

Salt Lake City, UT 84145-5000

Erika M. Larsen

Attorney at SNOW CHRISTENSEN & MARTINEAU

10 Exchange Place 11Th Fl, Po Box 45000

Salt Lake City, UT 84145-5000

Jeffrey D. Enquist

Attorney at CHRISTENSEN & JENSEN PC

257 E 200 S Ste 1100

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Defendant's Reply MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Alert Holdings Group. (Larsen, Erika) Modified on 6/17/2019-Should have been submitted as a Reply to Response to Motion (jmr). (Entered: 06/05/2019)

16 #2

Exhibit 2 - Declaration of M. Smith

16 #1

Exhibit 1 - Declaration of K. Goldstein

#16

(#16) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Vivint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of K. Goldstein, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of M. Smith)(James, Justin) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Erika M. Larsen on behalf of Alert Holdings Group (Larsen, Erika) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy S. Stuart on behalf of Alert Holdings Group (Stuart, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

#10

(#10) SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Ruth A. Shapiro replacing Jeffrey D. Enquist and Stephen Dayn Kelson as counsel on behalf of Alert Holdings Group. (Shapiro, Ruth) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Alert Holdings Group, Plaintiff Vivint. Form due by 5/10/2019. (las) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Alert Holdings Group, Plaintiff Vivint. (las) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Enquist on behalf of Alert Holdings Group (Enquist, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

#6

(#6) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Alert Holdings Group. (Kelson, Stephen) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Dayn Kelson on behalf of Alert Holdings Group (Kelson, Stephen) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Alert Holdings Group (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3240434) filed by Vivint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (James, Justin) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff Vivint is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #6 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction: Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2019 at 03:00 PM in Rm 8.100 before Judge Clark Waddoups. (cdp) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Defendant's Reply MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Alert Holdings Group. (Larsen, Erika) Modified on 6/17/2019-Should have been submitted as a Reply to Response to Motion (jmr). (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Vivint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of K. Goldstein, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of M. Smith)(James, Justin) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • (#15) All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. (las) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • (#14) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Alert Holdings Group. (las) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • (#13) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Vivint. (las) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Erika M. Larsen on behalf of Alert Holdings Group (Larsen, Erika) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy S. Stuart on behalf of Alert Holdings Group (Stuart, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Ruth A. Shapiro replacing Jeffrey D. Enquist and Stephen Dayn Kelson as counsel on behalf of Alert Holdings Group. (Shapiro, Ruth) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Alert Holdings Group, Plaintiff Vivint. Form due by 5/10/2019. (las) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Alert Holdings Group, Plaintiff Vivint. (las) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Enquist on behalf of Alert Holdings Group (Enquist, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Alert Holdings Group. (Kelson, Stephen) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Dayn Kelson on behalf of Alert Holdings Group (Kelson, Stephen) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 4/2/2019. (las) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Alert Holdings Group. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Alert Holdings Group (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3240434) filed by Vivint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (James, Justin) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff Vivint is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.