This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:43:19 (UTC).

Vivas et al v. Cerina General Contracting, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Vivas filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Cerina General Contracting, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cheryl L. Pollak and Margo K. Brodie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02931

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cheryl L. Pollak

Presiding Judge

Margo K. Brodie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Marlon Rodriguez

Julio Vivas

Defendants

Ceprine Construction Inc.

Ivan Cerina

Cerina General Contracting, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Louis Pechman

Attorney at Pechman Law Group PLLC

488 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Laura Gerace Rodriguez

Attorney at Pechman Law Group PLLC

488 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Defendant Attorney

Alex Leibson

Attorney at Abrams Fensterman Fensterman Eisman Formato Ferrara & Wolf L

1111 Marcus Avenue, Suite 107

New Hyde Park, NY 11042

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Gerace Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Rodriguez, Laura) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Marlon Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Laura) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION extending defendants' time to answer by Ceprine Construction Inc., Ivan Cerina, Cerina General Contracting, Inc. (Leibson, Alex) Modified on 7/10/2019 (Graham, Emily). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julio Vivas, Marlon Rodriguez. Cerina General Contracting, Inc. served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Pechman, Louis) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

1 #3

Proposed Summons

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Ceprine Construction Inc., Ivan Cerina, Cerina General Contracting, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11489119 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Julio Vivas, Marlon Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Pechman, Louis) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julio Vivas, Marlon Rodriguez. Ivan Cerina served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Pechman, Louis) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julio Vivas, Marlon Rodriguez. Ceprine Construction Inc. served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Pechman, Louis) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

1 #4

Proposed Summons

#7

(#7) CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Julio Vivas (Rodriguez, Laura) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Leibson on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Leibson, Alex) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants to answer by 7/31/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 7/10/2019. (Graham, Emily) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STIPULATION extending defendants' time to answer by Ceprine Construction Inc., Ivan Cerina, Cerina General Contracting, Inc. (Leibson, Alex) Modified on 7/10/2019 (Graham, Emily). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Leibson on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Leibson, Alex) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2019
  • ELECTRONIC STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties are directed to provide a status letter to this Court within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Status Report due by 7/30/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 6/30/2019. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 06/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julio Vivas, Marlon Rodriguez. Ivan Cerina served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Pechman, Louis) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julio Vivas, Marlon Rodriguez. Cerina General Contracting, Inc. served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Pechman, Louis) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julio Vivas, Marlon Rodriguez. Ceprine Construction Inc. served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Pechman, Louis) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Julio Vivas (Rodriguez, Laura) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Marlon Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Laura) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Gerace Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Rodriguez, Laura) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Ceprine Construction Inc., Ivan Cerina, Cerina General Contracting, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11489119 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Julio Vivas, Marlon Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Pechman, Louis) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.