This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 05:04:30 (UTC).

VITREO-RETINAL CONSULTANTS, INC. v. DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 VITREO-RETINAL CONSULTANTS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kim R. Gibson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00185

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kim R. Gibson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VITREO-RETINAL CONSULTANTS, INC.

Defendants

DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER doing business as PENN HIGHLANDS DUBOIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alan E. Cech

Attorney at Murtagh, Hobaugh & Cech, LLC

110 Swinderman Road

Wexford, PA 15090

Adam K. Hobaugh

Attorney at Murtagh, Hobaugh & Cech

110 Swinderman Road

Wexford, PA 15090

Defendant Attorneys

Lisa Smith Presta

Attorney at MacDonald, Illig, Jones & Britton

100 State Street, Suite 700

Erie, PA 16507-1459

Jamie R. Schumacher

Attorney at MacDonald, Illig, Jones and Britton LLP

100 State Street, Suite 700

Erie, PA 16507

 

Court Documents

17 #10

Exhibit

17 #9

Exhibit

17 #8

Exhibit

17 #7

Exhibit

17 #6

Exhibit

17 #5

Exhibit

17 #4

Exhibit

17 #3

Exhibit

17 #2

Exhibit

17 #1

Exhibit

#17

(#17) DECLARATION re #14 Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit) (Presta, Lisa) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

16 #1

Exhibit

#16

(#16) DECLARATION re #14 Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Presta, Lisa) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#15

(#15) BRIEF in Support of #14 Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Presta, Lisa) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#14

(#14) RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Presta, Lisa) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

7 #3

Proposed Order Order

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by VITREO-RETINAL CONSULTANTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order Order) (Cech, Alan) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DECLARATION re #14 Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit) (Presta, Lisa) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DECLARATION re #14 Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Presta, Lisa) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) BRIEF in Support of #14 Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Presta, Lisa) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Presta, Lisa) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Presta, Lisa) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #11 Consent Motion to Reschedule Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction is rescheduled for 1/10/2020, at 10:00 am. before Judge Gibson. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 12/12/2019. (dlg) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Consent MOTION to Continue January 3, 2020 Hearing Related to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Presta, Lisa) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie R. Schumacher on behalf of DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Schumacher, Jamie) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Smith Presta on behalf of DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Presta, Lisa) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction is scheduled for 1/3/2020, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom A - Johnstown before Judge Kim R. Gibson. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter (dlg) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) BRIEF in Support re #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by VITREO-RETINAL CONSULTANTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Cech, Alan) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by VITREO-RETINAL CONSULTANTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order Order) (Cech, Alan) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VITREO-RETINAL CONSULTANTS, INC. DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019. (Hobaugh, Adam) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam K. Hobaugh on behalf of VITREO-RETINAL CONSULTANTS, INC. (Hobaugh, Adam) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by VITREO-RETINAL CONSULTANTS, INC. (Cech, Alan) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (krh) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (jm) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against DUBOIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5343638), filed by VITREO-RETINAL CONSULTANTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (jm) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less