This case was last updated from PACER on 04/05/2019 at 08:08:01 (UTC).

Vitellaro v. Peters et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2019 Vitellaro filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Peters. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Anna J. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00174

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Mustafa T. Kasubhai

Anna J. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melissa Vitellaro

Defendants

Dawnell Meyer

Dr. Christopher DiGiulio

Joe DeCamp

Steve Shelton

John/Jane (1-10) Does

Tony Klein

Ericka Sage

Michael Gower

Dr. Danielle Fuzi

Brian Belleque

Joe Bugher

Don Dravis

State of Oregon

Rob Persson

Colette Peters

Heidi Steward

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Leonard W. Williamson

Attorney at Van Ness Williamson

285 Liberty Rd Ne, Suite 360

Salem, OR 97301

Michelle R. Burrows

Attorney at Michelle R. Burrows, PC

1333 Ne Orenco Station Pkwy, Suite 525

Hillsboro, OR 97124

Defendant Attorney

Andrew D. Campbell

Attorney at Heltzel Williams, PC

P.O. Box 1048

Salem, OR 97308

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Notice of Appearance of Andrew D. Campbell appearing on behalf of Tony Klein Filed by on behalf of Tony Klein. (Campbell, Andrew) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

#4

(#4) Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai to Judge Anna J. Brown. (eo) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Brian Belleque, Joe Bugher, Joe DeCamp, Christopher DiGiulio, Don Dravis, Danielle Fuzi, Michael Gower, Tony Klein, Dawnell Meyer, State of Oregon, Rob Persson, Colette Peters, Ericka Sage, Steve Shelton, Heidi Steward. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/5/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/5/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 7/5/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (sss) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

1 #16

Proposed Summons

1 #15

Proposed Summons

1 #14

Proposed Summons

1 #13

Proposed Summons

1 #12

Proposed Summons

1 #11

Proposed Summons

1 #10

Proposed Summons

1 #9

Proposed Summons

1 #6

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5726642 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Melissa Vitellaro against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Proposed Summons, #12 Proposed Summons, #13 Proposed Summons, #14 Proposed Summons, #15 Proposed Summons, #16 Proposed Summons). (Burrows, Michelle) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice of Appearance of Andrew D. Campbell appearing on behalf of Tony Klein Filed by on behalf of Tony Klein. (Campbell, Andrew) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • (#6) MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Status Conference. Joint Status Report and proposed case-management schedule due by Noon on 5/2/2019. Telephonic Status Conference is set for 5/16/2019 at 3:00 PM in Portland by telephone before Judge Anna J. Brown. Leonard W. Williamson and Michelle R. Burrows present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Andrew D. Hallman, Jessica Spooner, and Andrew Campbell present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Jill Jessup. Judge Anna J. Brown presiding. (jy) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • (#5) Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Telephonic Status Conference is set for 3/6/2019 at 3:00 PM in Portland by telephone before Judge Anna J. Brown. (jy) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai to Judge Anna J. Brown. (eo) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Brian Belleque, Joe Bugher, Joe DeCamp, Christopher DiGiulio, Don Dravis, Danielle Fuzi, Michael Gower, Tony Klein, Dawnell Meyer, State of Oregon, Rob Persson, Colette Peters, Ericka Sage, Steve Shelton, Heidi Steward. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/5/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/5/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 7/5/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (sss) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5726642 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Melissa Vitellaro against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Proposed Summons, #12 Proposed Summons, #13 Proposed Summons, #14 Proposed Summons, #15 Proposed Summons, #16 Proposed Summons). (Burrows, Michelle) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.