This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2020 at 08:05:33 (UTC).

Vitaworks IP, LLC et al v. Glanbia Nutritionals (NA), Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Vitaworks IP, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Glanbia Nutritionals NA , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02259

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vitaworks IP, LLC

Vitaworks, LLC

Defendant

Glanbia Nutritionals (NA), Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jack B. Blumenfeld

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Megan Elizabeth Dellinger

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Defendant Attorney

Alessandra Glorioso

Attorney at Dorsey & Whitney (Delaware) LLP

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1010

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to MOVE or ANSWER in Response to the Complaint to March 2, 2020 - filed by Glanbia Nutritionals (NA), Inc.. (Glorioso, Alessandra) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,745,258 B1 ;9,815,778 B1 ;9,926,265 B1. (apk) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A-C

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vitaworks, LLC, Vitaworks IP, LLC. Glanbia Nutritionals (NA), Inc. served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Dellinger, Megan) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Vitaworks IP, LLC, Vitaworks, LLC. (apk) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Glanbia Nutritionals (NA), Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2799436.) - filed by Vitaworks, LLC, Vitaworks IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to MOVE or ANSWER in Response to the Complaint to March 2, 2020 filed by Glanbia Nutritionals (NA), Inc. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Glanbia Nutritionals (NA), Inc. answer due 3/2/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/3/2020. (fms) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to MOVE or ANSWER in Response to the Complaint to March 2, 2020 - filed by Glanbia Nutritionals (NA), Inc.. (Glorioso, Alessandra) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02259-CFC, 1:19-cv-02260-CFC (rjb) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vitaworks, LLC, Vitaworks IP, LLC. Glanbia Nutritionals (NA), Inc. served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Dellinger, Megan) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Glanbia Nutritionals (NA), Inc. on 12/12/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (apk) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Vitaworks IP, LLC, Vitaworks, LLC. (apk) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,745,258 B1 ;9,815,778 B1 ;9,926,265 B1. (apk) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Glanbia Nutritionals (NA), Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2799436.) - filed by Vitaworks, LLC, Vitaworks IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.