Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/10/2021 at 07:38:43 (UTC).

Vitale-Renner v. Sixt Rent-A-Car, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/11/2020 Vitale-Renner filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Sixt Rent-A-Car, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Aileen M. Cannon and Patrick M. Hunt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-62289

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aileen M. Cannon

Referral Judge

Patrick M. Hunt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kristina Vitale-Renner

Coral Gables, FL 33143

Defendants

Sixt Rent-A-Car

National Casualty Company

Sixt Rent-A-Car, LLC

Empire Fire And Marine Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher J. Lynch

Attorney at Christopher J. Lynch, P.A.

6915 Red Road, Suite 208

Coral Gables, FL 33143

Jacob Lawrence Phillips

Attorney at Normand PLLC

3165 Mccrory Place, Ste. 175

Orlando, FL 32803

Edmund Alonso Normand

Attorney at Normand PLLC

3165 Mccrory Place, Ste. 175

Orlando, FL 32803

Andrew John Shamis

Attorney at Shamis & Gentile P.A.

14 N.E. 1St Ave, Ste. 1205

Miami, FL 33132

Defendant Attorneys

Irene Oria

Attorney at FISHERBROYLES, LLP

199 E. Flagler St., #550

Miami, FL 33131

Patrick M. Emery

Attorney at FisherBroyles, LLP

945 East Paces Ferry Rd Ne, Suite 2000

Atlanta, GA 30326

Bradley Steven Fischer

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

110 Se 6Th Street, Suite 2600

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sixt Rent-A-Car, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sixt SE, Corporate Parent Sixt Transatlantik GmbH for Sixt Rent-A-Car, LLC (Oria, Irene) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

32 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Order on Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Res

#32

(#32) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #19 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by Empire Fire And Marine Insurance Company. Attorney Bradley Steven Fischer added to party Empire Fire And Marine Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Order on Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Class Action Complaint)(Fischer, Bradley) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

29 #1

Service of Process

#29

(#29) NOTICE by Kristina Vitale-Renner (Attachments: #1 Service of Process) (Lynch, Christopher) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

28 #1

Text of Proposed Order (Amended Proposed Order) Granting Defendant Sixt Rent A C

#28

(#28) REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint MOTION to Seal Confidential Commercial Information in the Complaint and to Remove Complaint from Docket re #1 Complaint filed by Sixt Rent-A-Car, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Amended Proposed Order) Granting Defendant Sixt Rent A Car, LLC's Motion to Strike and Seal Confidential Commercial Information in the Complaint and to Remove Complaint from the Docket)(Oria, Irene) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

22 #1

Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Strike and Seal Confidential Commercia

#19

(#30) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #19 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kristina Vitale-Renner. Empire Fire And Marine Insurance Company served on 12/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. (For Image See DE#29 ) (cds) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to National Casualty Company, Sixt Rent-A-Car, LLC. (cds) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

6 #2

Summon(s)

6 #1

Summon(s)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Kristina Vitale-Renner (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s)) (Lynch, Christopher) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob Lawrence Phillips on behalf of Kristina Vitale-Renner. Attorney Jacob Lawrence Phillips added to party Kristina Vitale-Renner(pty:pla). (Phillips, Jacob) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edmund Alonso Normand on behalf of Kristina Vitale-Renner. Attorney Edmund Alonso Normand added to party Kristina Vitale-Renner(pty:pla). (Normand, Edmund) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew John Shamis on behalf of Kristina Vitale-Renner. Attorney Andrew John Shamis added to party Kristina Vitale-Renner(pty:pla). (Shamis, Andrew) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#24) AFFIDAVIT signed by: Patrick M. Emery re #22 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint MOTION to Seal Confidential Commercial Information in the Complaint and to Remove Complaint from Docket re #1 Complaint by Sixt Rent-A-Car, LLC (Oria, Irene) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sixt Rent-A-Car, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sixt SE, Corporate Parent Sixt Transatlantik GmbH for Sixt Rent-A-Car, LLC (Oria, Irene) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #19 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by Empire Fire And Marine Insurance Company. Attorney Bradley Steven Fischer added to party Empire Fire And Marine Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Order on Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Class Action Complaint)(Fischer, Bradley) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Clerks Notice to Filer re #29 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, See DE# 30 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (cds) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #19 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kristina Vitale-Renner. Empire Fire And Marine Insurance Company served on 12/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. (For Image See DE#29 ) (cds) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE by Kristina Vitale-Renner (Attachments: #1 Service of Process) (Lynch, Christopher) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint MOTION to Seal Confidential Commercial Information in the Complaint and to Remove Complaint from Docket re #1 Complaint filed by Sixt Rent-A-Car, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Amended Proposed Order) Granting Defendant Sixt Rent A Car, LLC's Motion to Strike and Seal Confidential Commercial Information in the Complaint and to Remove Complaint from the Docket)(Oria, Irene) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint MOTION to Seal Confidential Commercial Information in the Complaint and to Remove Complaint from Docket re #1 Complaint filed by Kristina Vitale-Renner. Replies due by 1/4/2021. (Phillips, Jacob) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Summons Issued as to Empire Fire And Marine Insurance Company. (cds) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Kristina Vitale-Renner (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Lynch, Christopher) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) AFFIDAVIT signed by: Patrick M. Emery re #22 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint MOTION to Seal Confidential Commercial Information in the Complaint and to Remove Complaint from Docket re #1 Complaint by Sixt Rent-A-Car, LLC (Oria, Irene) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Irene Oria on behalf of Sixt Rent-A-Car, LLC. Attorney Irene Oria added to party Sixt Rent-A-Car, LLC(pty:dft). (Oria, Irene) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATION AND ORDER OF TRANSFER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt added. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 11/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (bms) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to District Judge Aileen M Cannon for all further proceedings, Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 11/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (bms) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to National Casualty Company, Sixt Rent-A-Car, LLC. (cds) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Kristina Vitale-Renner (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s)) (Lynch, Christopher) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob Lawrence Phillips on behalf of Kristina Vitale-Renner. Attorney Jacob Lawrence Phillips added to party Kristina Vitale-Renner(pty:pla). (Phillips, Jacob) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edmund Alonso Normand on behalf of Kristina Vitale-Renner. Attorney Edmund Alonso Normand added to party Kristina Vitale-Renner(pty:pla). (Normand, Edmund) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew John Shamis on behalf of Kristina Vitale-Renner. Attorney Andrew John Shamis added to party Kristina Vitale-Renner(pty:pla). (Shamis, Andrew) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13848028, filed by Kristina Vitale-Renner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lynch, Christopher) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SIXT RENT-A-CAR LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EMPIRE FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick M. Emery