Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/22/2019 at 08:00:36 (UTC).

Vista Peak Ventures, LLC v. Giantplus Technology Co., Ltd.

Case Summary

On 05/23/2019 Vista Peak Ventures, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Giantplus Technology Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00185

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vista Peak Ventures, LLC

Defendant

Giantplus Technology Co., Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrea Leigh Fair

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Claire Abernathy Henry

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Patrick Joseph Conroy

Attorney at Bragalone Conroy PC

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 4500W

Dallas, TX 75201

Terry Afif Saad

Attorney at Bragalone Conroy PC

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 4500W

Dallas, TX 75201

Daniel Fletcher Olejko

Attorney at Bragalone Conroy PC

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 4500W

Dallas, TX 75201

Thomas William Kennedy, Jr

Attorney at Bragalone Conroy PC

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 4500W

Dallas, TX 75201

Marcus Benavides

Attorney at Bragalone Conroy PC

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 4500W

Dallas, TX 75201

Jerry Tice, II

Attorney at Bragalone Conroy PC

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 4500W

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorneys

Calli A Turner

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP - Dallas

2501 North Harwood Street, Suite 1900

Dallas, TX 75201

Alexander P. Ott

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP - DC

500 North Capitol Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Jacob Louis Clark

Attorney at MWE China Law Offices

Jin Mao Tower, 28Th Fl., 88 Century Blvd

Pudong New District, Shanghai, PRC 200121

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Giantplus Technology Co., Ltd. identifying Other Affiliate Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. for Giantplus Technology Co., Ltd.. (Turner, Calli) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jacob Louis Clark on behalf of Giantplus Technology Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7348223. (Clark, Jacob) (Entered: 07/14/2019)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Alexander P. Ott on behalf of Giantplus Technology Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7346803. (Ott, Alexander) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

16 #5

Text of Proposed Order

16 #4

Exhibit C

16 #3

Exhibit B

16 #2

Exhibit A

16 #1

Affidavit of Szu-Yun Lin

#16

(#16) MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process by Giantplus Technology Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Szu-Yun Lin, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Calli) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Fletcher Olejko on behalf of Vista Peak Ventures, LLC (Olejko, Daniel) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas William Kennedy, Jr on behalf of Vista Peak Ventures, LLC (Kennedy, Thomas) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Giantplus Technology Co., Ltd.. (klc, ) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of Vista Peak Ventures, LLC (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Vista Peak Ventures, LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#2

(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Vista Peak Ventures, LLC. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Vista Peak Ventures, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7280713.), filed by Vista Peak Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Henry, Claire) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Giantplus Technology Co., Ltd. identifying Other Affiliate Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. for Giantplus Technology Co., Ltd.. (Turner, Calli) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jacob Louis Clark on behalf of Giantplus Technology Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7348223. (Clark, Jacob) (Entered: 07/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Alexander P. Ott on behalf of Giantplus Technology Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7346803. (Ott, Alexander) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process by Giantplus Technology Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Szu-Yun Lin, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Calli) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Giantplus Technology Co., Ltd. to 7/15/2019. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Giantplus Technology Co., Ltd..( Turner, Calli) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) AFFIDAVIT received re AFFIDAVIT OF DANIEL F. OLEJKO IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FORCLERK TO SERVE GIANTPLUS TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD, by Vista Peak Ventures, LLC (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUMMONS Issued as to Giantplus Technology Co., Ltd.. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry Afif Saad on behalf of Vista Peak Ventures, LLC (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Joseph Conroy on behalf of Vista Peak Ventures, LLC (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Fletcher Olejko on behalf of Vista Peak Ventures, LLC (Olejko, Daniel) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas William Kennedy, Jr on behalf of Vista Peak Ventures, LLC (Kennedy, Thomas) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Giantplus Technology Co., Ltd.. (klc, ) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of Vista Peak Ventures, LLC (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Vista Peak Ventures, LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Vista Peak Ventures, LLC. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Vista Peak Ventures, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7280713.), filed by Vista Peak Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Henry, Claire) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vista Peak Ventures, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Terry Afif Saad

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Fletcher Olejko