This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 16:15:36 (UTC).

Vista Food Exchange, Inc. v. Law et al

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 Vista Food Exchange, Inc filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Law. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L. Carter, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04689

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew L. Carter, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vista Food Exchange, Inc.

Suite B-101

Bronx, NY 10474

Defendants

C.A.L

Ada Law

Simon Law

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan Cory Scott

Attorney at Jonathan C. Scott P.C.

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 4900W

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorneys

Gregory Nahas

Attorney at Pardalis & Nohavicka, LLP

950 Third Ave, 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Eleni Melekou

Attorney at Pardalis & Nohavicka, LLP

950 Third Ave, 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eleni Melekou on behalf of C.A.L, Ada Law, Simon Law..(Melekou, Eleni) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#17

(#17) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Nahas on behalf of C.A.L, Ada Law, Simon Law..(Nahas, Gregory) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#16

(#16) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:17cv7454. Document filed by Vista Food Exchange, Inc...(Scott, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

#15

(#15) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to C.A.L. (sj) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

#14

(#14) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Simon Law. (sj) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

#13

(#13) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ada Law. (sj) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

#12

(#12) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to C.A.L., a Minor, re: #9 Complaint. Document filed by Vista Food Exchange, Inc...(Scott, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

(#12) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to C.A.L., a Minor, re: #9 Complaint. Document filed by Vista Food Exchange, Inc...(Scott, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#8

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

#6

No Description Available

#5

(#5) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to C.A.L, a Minor, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Vista Food Exchange, Inc...(Scott, Jonathan) Modified on 5/27/2021 (sj). (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#4

(#4) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Simon Law, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Vista Food Exchange, Inc...(Scott, Jonathan) Modified on 5/27/2021 (sj). (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#3

(#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ada Law, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Vista Food Exchange, Inc..(Scott, Jonathan) Modified on 5/27/2021 (sj). (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Scott, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#1

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jonathan Cory Scott to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eleni Melekou on behalf of C.A.L, Ada Law, Simon Law..(Melekou, Eleni) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Nahas on behalf of C.A.L, Ada Law, Simon Law..(Nahas, Gregory) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:17-cv-07454-ALC-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:17cv7454. Document filed by Vista Food Exchange, Inc...(Scott, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to C.A.L. (sj) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Simon Law. (sj) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ada Law. (sj) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to C.A.L., a Minor, re: #9 Complaint. Document filed by Vista Food Exchange, Inc...(Scott, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Jonathan Cory Scott, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (sj) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jonathan Cory Scott. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jonathan Cory Scott to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to C.A.L, a Minor, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Vista Food Exchange, Inc...(Scott, Jonathan) Modified on 5/27/2021 (sj). (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Simon Law, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Vista Food Exchange, Inc...(Scott, Jonathan) Modified on 5/27/2021 (sj). (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ada Law, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Vista Food Exchange, Inc..(Scott, Jonathan) Modified on 5/27/2021 (sj). (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Scott, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against Vista Food Exchange, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24591856)Document filed by Vista Food Exchange, Inc..(Scott, Jonathan) Modified on 5/27/2021 (sj). (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Jonathan Cory Scott. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jonathan Cory Scott to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 6/1/2021. (jgo) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE CAL AGENTS REALTY, INC. is a litigant