This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/14/2020 at 08:58:34 (UTC).

Virtual Compute Corporation v. NVIDIA

Case Summary

On 09/15/2020 Virtual Compute Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against NVIDIA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Keith P Ellison. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-03216

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Keith P Ellison

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Virtual Compute Corporation

Defendant

NVIDIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin Francis Foster

Attorney at Foster Salisbury

405 Main St, Ste 722

Houston, TX 77002

Anthony R. Friedman

Attorney at The Simon Law Firm PC

800 Market St., Ste. 1700

St. Louis, MO 63101

Anthony G. Simon

Attorney at The Simon Law Firm PC

800 Market St., Ste. 1700

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Complaint

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Virtual Compute Corporation. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Issuance of Summons as to NVIDIA, filed.(Foster, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Anthony R. Friedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Anthony G. Simon to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (DawnWaggoneradi, 4) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/15/2021 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(DawnWaggoneradi, 4) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Anthony R. Friedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Virtual Compute Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/6/2020. (Foster, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Anthony G. Simon to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Virtual Compute Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/6/2020. (Foster, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against NVIDIA (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25208101) filed by Virtual Compute Corporation.(Foster, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nvidia Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Foster

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony G. Simon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony R. Friedman