This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/21/2023 at 07:29:32 (UTC).

VIRK et al v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al

Case Summary

On 12/23/2022 VIRK filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against DEPARTMENT OF STATE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is MIA ROBERTS PEREZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-05134

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MIA ROBERTS PEREZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BALVIR SINGH VIRK

JASMEET KAUR

A.K.

Defendants

DEPARTMENT OF STATE

U.S. CONSULATE GENERAL MUMBAI

U.S. SECRETARY OF STATE, ANTONY J. BLINKEN

DEPUTY ASSISTANT SECRETARY FOR VISA SERVICES, JULIE STUFFT

CONSULAR GENERAL MIKE HANKEY

CHIEF, CONSULAR SECTION, JOHN BALLARD

DOES #1-10

CHRISTOPHER WRAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer P Haines

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER OF 2/3/23 THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ FOR FURTHE RPROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT GEORGE WYLESOL ON 2/3/23. 2/6/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketAcceptance letter, Complaint and Summons emailed U.S. Atty. (er) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF 2/3/23 THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ FOR FURTHE RPROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT GEORGE WYLESOL ON 2/3/23. 2/6/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by A.K., JASMEET KAUR, BALVIR SINGH VIRK re #1 Complaint (Attorney), Completed (Signed) Designation Form (Haines, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to CHIEF, CONSULAR SECTION, JOHN BALLARD, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPUTY ASSISTANT SECRETARY FOR VISA SERVICES, JULIE STUFFT, MIKE HANKEY, U.S. CONSULATE GENERAL MUMBAI, U.S. SECRETARY OF STATE, ANTONY J. BLINKEN, CHRISTOPHER WRAY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: E-mailed to Counsel and US Attorney on 12/23/22 (mas) Modified on 12/28/2022 (mas). (Entered: 12/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketAttorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED Designation Form in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Related Case section is incomplete. A signature is required. (sbt) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ANTONY J. BLINKEN, JOHN BALLARD, DOES #1-10, MIKE HANKEY, JULIE STUFFT, U.S. CONSULATE GENERAL MUMBAI, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, CHRISTOPHER WRAY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16393492.), filed by AVNEET KAUR, JASMEET KAUR, BALVIR SINGH VIRK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 1-14)(Haines, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less