This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/28/2021 at 07:05:26 (UTC).

Viray v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 Viray filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Unum Life Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James Donato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00644

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Donato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lota Viray

Orinda, CA 94563

Defendant

Unum Life Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Randall Noah

Attorney at Law Offices of P. Randall Noah

21 Orinda Way, Suite C, #316

Orinda, CA 94563

Defendant Attorneys

Tatiana Semerjian Nunneri

Attorney at Meserve, Mumper & Hughes LLP

1000 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1860

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2457

Nicole Yvette Blohm

Attorney at Meserve Mumper & Hughes LLP

1000 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1860

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) Certificate of Interested Entities by Unum Life Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Unum Group, Corporate Parent Unum Life Insurance Company of America for Unum Life Insurance Company of America. re #15 Answer to Complaint (Blohm, Nicole) (Filed on 3/26/2021) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to Complaint byUnum Life Insurance Company of America. (Nunneri, Tatiana) (Filed on 3/26/2021) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by Not More Than 30 Days filed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Nunneri, Tatiana) (Filed on 2/18/2021) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#13

(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/29/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 4/22/2021. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/17/21. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

12 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#12

(#12) Case REASSIGN to Judge James Donato. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#9

(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Unum Life Insurance Company of America.. (Nunneri, Tatiana) (Filed on 2/16/2021) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lota Viray.. (Noah, Paul) (Filed on 2/1/2021) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Lota Viray Plaintiff (Noah, Paul) (Filed on 2/1/2021) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#6

(#6) Civil Cover Sheet by Lota Viray . (Noah, Paul) (Filed on 1/28/2021) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2021) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/21/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2021) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Noah, Paul) (Filed on 1/27/2021) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Unum Life Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15499096.). Filed byLota Viray. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Noah, Paul) (Filed on 1/27/2021) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Certificate of Interested Entities by Unum Life Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Unum Group, Corporate Parent Unum Life Insurance Company of America for Unum Life Insurance Company of America. re #15 Answer to Complaint (Blohm, Nicole) (Filed on 3/26/2021) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Complaint byUnum Life Insurance Company of America. (Nunneri, Tatiana) (Filed on 3/26/2021) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by Not More Than 30 Days filed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Nunneri, Tatiana) (Filed on 2/18/2021) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/29/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 4/22/2021. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/17/21. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Case REASSIGN to Judge James Donato. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • Docket(#11) This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Unum Life Insurance Company of America.. (Nunneri, Tatiana) (Filed on 2/16/2021) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lota Viray.. (Noah, Paul) (Filed on 2/1/2021) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Lota Viray Plaintiff (Noah, Paul) (Filed on 2/1/2021) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Civil Cover Sheet by Lota Viray . (Noah, Paul) (Filed on 1/28/2021) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2021) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/21/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2021) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19) used at case opening. Please complete and re-file as a separate docket entry correct Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/20 re: #1 . #1 Complaint filed y Lota Viray (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2021) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/10/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2021) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Noah, Paul) (Filed on 1/27/2021) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Unum Life Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15499096.). Filed byLota Viray. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Noah, Paul) (Filed on 1/27/2021) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Unum Life Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Randall Noah