This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2019 at 07:32:22 (UTC).

Violett v. King et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2019 Violett filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against King. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Claria Horn Boom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00524

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claria Horn Boom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald Ray Violett

Lagrange, KY 40032

Defendants

Deanna Mann

Daniel King

Captain Jeffery Hope

Warden Anna Valentine

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Envelope

1 #2

Exhibit

#6

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE (EBOC) Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 8/5/2019, granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is required to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 under an installment plan. The Clerk of this Court is directed to open an account for the payment of the filing fee in this action. Having addressed the filing fee issue, the Court must now undertake a preliminary review of Plaintiff's complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Once the review is complete, an order will be entered informing the parties of what steps, if any, must be taken. Please see Order for further details. cc: Plaintiff; Financial Section, USDC, WDKY; Kentucky State Reformatory (KD) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Jeffery Hope, Daniel King, Deanna Mann, Anna Valentine, filed by Donald Ray Violett. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Exhibit) (DJT) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

8 #1

Envelope

#8

(#8) MOTION to Depose by Plaintiff Donald Ray Violett. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (KD) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#3

(#3) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (DJT) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Donald Ray Violett. (KD) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis not filed, nor Summons for Defendants filed.. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 8/16/2019. (DJT) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Depose by Plaintiff Donald Ray Violett. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (KD) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE (EBOC) Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 8/5/2019, granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is required to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 under an installment plan. The Clerk of this Court is directed to open an account for the payment of the filing fee in this action. Having addressed the filing fee issue, the Court must now undertake a preliminary review of Plaintiff's complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Once the review is complete, an order will be entered informing the parties of what steps, if any, must be taken. Please see Order for further details. cc: Plaintiff; Financial Section, USDC, WDKY; Kentucky State Reformatory (KD) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Donald Ray Violett. (KD) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Donald Ray Violett. (KD) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis not filed, nor Summons for Defendants filed.. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 8/16/2019. (DJT) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (DJT) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SEALED DOCUMENT by Donald Ray Violett. (DJT) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Jeffery Hope, Daniel King, Deanna Mann, Anna Valentine, filed by Donald Ray Violett. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Exhibit) (DJT) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.