This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/12/2022 at 08:51:07 (UTC).

Vintage Realty Co L L C et al v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03 et al

Case Summary

On 12/14/2021 Vintage Realty Co L L C filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04300

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Vintage Realty Co L L C

Country Club Pointe L L C

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03

Indian Harbor Insurance Co

Q B E Specialty Insurance Co

Steadfast Insurance Co

General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona

United Specialty Insurance Co

Lexington Insurance Co

Safety Specialty Insurance Co

H D I Global Specialty S E

Old Republic Union Insurance Co

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Country Club Pointe L L C

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Layne A Clark, Jr

Attorney at Wiener Weiss & Madison

P O Box 21990

Shreveport, LA 71120-1990

Reid Allen Jones

Attorney at Wiener Weiss & Madison

P O Box 21990

Shreveport, LA 71120-1990

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

D Russell Holwadel

Attorney at Adams Hoefer et al (NO)

400 Poydras St Ste 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Melanie Helaine Melasky

Attorney at McCranie Sistruck et al (NO)

909 Poydras St Ste 1000

New Orleans, LA 70112

Bruce R Hoefer, Jr

Attorney at Adams Hoefer et al (NO)

400 Poydras St Ste 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Heather England Reznik

Attorney at Adams Hoefer et al (NO)

400 Poydras St Ste 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Kyle Matthew Truxillo

Attorney at Adams Hoefer et al (NO)

400 Poydras St Ste 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Phillip J Rew

Attorney at Adams Hoefer et al (NO)

400 Poydras St Ste 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Richard R Stedman, II

5209 Perrier St

New Orleans, LA 70115

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER. Considering the foregoing Motion to Stay and Motion to Continue [doc. 13], the court orders that the motions be GRANTED and that this matter be stayed and that all briefing deadlines relating to the pending Motion to Compel Arbitration [doc. 7] be continued while the parties attempt mediation of their dispute. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/21/2022. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

13 #1

Proposed order

#13

(#13) MOTION to Stay re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings MOTION to Continue Hearings & Deadlines by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Rew, Phillip). Added MOTION to Continue on 1/20/2022 (Crick, S). (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#12

(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent State National Insurance Co Inc for United Specialty Insurance Co; Corporate Parents, American International Group Inc, A I G Property Casualty U S Inc, A I G Property Casualty Inc for Lexington Insurance Co; Corporate Parent, S C O R Reinsurance Co Inc for General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona; Corporate Parents, Hannover Re, H D I Global S E, Talanx Group, for H D I Global Specialty S E; Corporate Parents, American International Group Inc, Fairfax Financial Holdings Ltd, Axis Capital Holdings Ltd, Tokio Marine Holdings Inc, Enstar Group Ltd, Hannover Re, Hiscox Ltd, Talanx A G, Sompo Holdings Inc, Kenmare Holdings Ltd, Brit Insurance Holdings Ltd, Tokio Marine Kiln Group Ltd, Argenta Holdings Ltd, Hannover Ruck S E, Haftpflichtverband der Deutschen Industrie V a G, Asta Capital Ltd, Beazley Furlonge Holdings Ltd, Exor Nederland N V, Beasley p l c, Q B E Insurance, Lancashire Holdings Ltd, Shelbourne Group Ltd, Cathedral Capital Holdings Ltd, Tokio Marine & Nichido Insurance Co Ltd, Other Affiliates, Talbot Underwriting Ltd, Brit Syndicates Ltd, Beazley Furlonge Ltd, Q B E Underwriting Ltd, Brit U W Ltd, Vanguard Group, Argenta Syndicate Management Ltd, Tokio Marine Kiln Syndicates Ltd, Asta Managing Agency Ltd, Asta Managing Agency Ltd, S G L No 1 Ltd, T Rowe Price, Apollo Syndicate Management Ltd, Apollo Partners L L P, D C B Ibeson, S A C White, Hiscox Syndicates Ltd, Catlin Syndicate Ltd, Inter Hannover (No 1) Ltd, PartnerRe Corporate Ltd, PartnerRe Ltd, S C O R Underwriting Ltd, S A Meacock & Co Ltd, Lancashire Syndicates Ltd, Atrium Underwriting Group Ltd, Catlin Underwriters Agencies Ltd, Canopius Managing Agents Ltd, Axis Corporate Capital U K Ltd, Axis Corporate Capital U K II Ltd, Tokio Marine Underwriting Ltd, Syndicate 510, Syndicate 33, Syndicate 2121, Syndicate 1969, Metacomet L L C, Syndicate 2623, Syndicate 727, Syndicate 623, Syndicate 2986, Syndicate 2003, Syndicate 4444, Syndicate 1861, Syndicate 1886, Syndicate 5886, Syndicate 1183, Syndicate 1301, Syndicate 2010, Syndicate 609, Atrium Underwriters Ltd, Syndicate 2988,Brit Ltd, Syndicate 3268, S C O R S E, Syndicate 1686, Syndicate 1856, Syndicate 1225 for Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03; Corporate Parents, Q B E Atlantic L L C, Q B E Investments (North America) Inc, Q B E Insurance Holdings Pty Ltd, Q B E Holdings Inc, Q B E Insurance Group Ltd for Q B E Specialty Insurance Co; Corporate Parents,X L Bermuda Ltd (Bermuda), X L I T Ltd (Cayman), X L Group Ltd (Bermuda), Exel Holding Ltd (Cayman), X L Specialty Insurance Co, X L Reinsurance America Inc (New York), X L America Inc (Delaware) for Indian Harbor Insurance Co; Corporate Parents, Zurich Insurance Co Ltd, Zurich Insurance Group Ltd, Zurich American Insurance Co, Zurich Holding Co of America Inc for Steadfast Insurance Co; Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corp for Old Republic Union Insurance Co; Corporate Parents, Safety National Casualty Corp,Tokyo Marine Holdings Inc for Safety Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Rew, Phillip) Modified on 1/4/2022 (Crick, S). (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Counterclaim. Country Club Pointe L L C answer due 2/3/2022; Vintage Realty Co L L C answer due 2/3/2022; granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings MOTION to Stay ( Responses due by 2/3/2022). Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/22/2021. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

10 #1

Proposed order

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Counterclaim , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings MOTION to Stay. (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/21/2021.) by Country Club Pointe L L C, Vintage Realty Co L L C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Jones, Reid) Modified on 12/21/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#8

(#8) EXHIBIT re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings Table of Contents and Table of Authorities by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Rew, Phillip) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

7 #3

Proposed order

7 #2

Exhibit 1-Case law

7 #1

Memorandum / Brief

#7

(#7) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit 1-Case law, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Rew, Phillip) Modified on 12/17/2021 to indicate #8 Table of Contents submitted as separate document. (Crick, S). Added MOTION to Stay on 12/17/2021 (Crick, S). (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#6

(#6) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/16/2021. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

5 #2

Exhibit B

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#4

(#4) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/15/2021. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Vintage Realty Co L L C, Country Club Pointe L L C by Steadfast Insurance Co, H I Global Specialty S E, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co.(Attorney Phillip J Rew added to party General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona(pty:dft), Indian Harbor Insurance Co(pty:dft), Lexington Insurance Co(pty:dft), Old Republic Union Insurance Co(pty:dft), Q B E Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft), Safety Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft), Steadfast Insurance Co(pty:dft), United Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Rew, Phillip) Modified on 12/15/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 12/14/2021)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER. Considering the foregoing Motion to Stay and Motion to Continue [doc. 13], the court orders that the motions be GRANTED and that this matter be stayed and that all briefing deadlines relating to the pending Motion to Compel Arbitration [doc. 7] be continued while the parties attempt mediation of their dispute. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/21/2022. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Transferred regarding #13 MOTION to Stay re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings MOTION to Continue Hearings & Deadlines., Set/Reset Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Stay re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings MOTION to Continue Hearings & Deadlines.(Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/19/2022.) Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Stay re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings MOTION to Continue Hearings & Deadlines by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Rew, Phillip). Added MOTION to Continue on 1/20/2022 (Crick, S). (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent State National Insurance Co Inc for United Specialty Insurance Co; Corporate Parents, American International Group Inc, A I G Property Casualty U S Inc, A I G Property Casualty Inc for Lexington Insurance Co; Corporate Parent, S C O R Reinsurance Co Inc for General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona; Corporate Parents, Hannover Re, H D I Global S E, Talanx Group, for H D I Global Specialty S E; Corporate Parents, American International Group Inc, Fairfax Financial Holdings Ltd, Axis Capital Holdings Ltd, Tokio Marine Holdings Inc, Enstar Group Ltd, Hannover Re, Hiscox Ltd, Talanx A G, Sompo Holdings Inc, Kenmare Holdings Ltd, Brit Insurance Holdings Ltd, Tokio Marine Kiln Group Ltd, Argenta Holdings Ltd, Hannover Ruck S E, Haftpflichtverband der Deutschen Industrie V a G, Asta Capital Ltd, Beazley Furlonge Holdings Ltd, Exor Nederland N V, Beasley p l c, Q B E Insurance, Lancashire Holdings Ltd, Shelbourne Group Ltd, Cathedral Capital Holdings Ltd, Tokio Marine & Nichido Insurance Co Ltd, Other Affiliates, Talbot Underwriting Ltd, Brit Syndicates Ltd, Beazley Furlonge Ltd, Q B E Underwriting Ltd, Brit U W Ltd, Vanguard Group, Argenta Syndicate Management Ltd, Tokio Marine Kiln Syndicates Ltd, Asta Managing Agency Ltd, Asta Managing Agency Ltd, S G L No 1 Ltd, T Rowe Price, Apollo Syndicate Management Ltd, Apollo Partners L L P, D C B Ibeson, S A C White, Hiscox Syndicates Ltd, Catlin Syndicate Ltd, Inter Hannover (No 1) Ltd, PartnerRe Corporate Ltd, PartnerRe Ltd, S C O R Underwriting Ltd, S A Meacock & Co Ltd, Lancashire Syndicates Ltd, Atrium Underwriting Group Ltd, Catlin Underwriters Agencies Ltd, Canopius Managing Agents Ltd, Axis Corporate Capital U K Ltd, Axis Corporate Capital U K II Ltd, Tokio Marine Underwriting Ltd, Syndicate 510, Syndicate 33, Syndicate 2121, Syndicate 1969, Metacomet L L C, Syndicate 2623, Syndicate 727, Syndicate 623, Syndicate 2986, Syndicate 2003, Syndicate 4444, Syndicate 1861, Syndicate 1886, Syndicate 5886, Syndicate 1183, Syndicate 1301, Syndicate 2010, Syndicate 609, Atrium Underwriters Ltd, Syndicate 2988,Brit Ltd, Syndicate 3268, S C O R S E, Syndicate 1686, Syndicate 1856, Syndicate 1225 for Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03; Corporate Parents, Q B E Atlantic L L C, Q B E Investments (North America) Inc, Q B E Insurance Holdings Pty Ltd, Q B E Holdings Inc, Q B E Insurance Group Ltd for Q B E Specialty Insurance Co; Corporate Parents,X L Bermuda Ltd (Bermuda), X L I T Ltd (Cayman), X L Group Ltd (Bermuda), Exel Holding Ltd (Cayman), X L Specialty Insurance Co, X L Reinsurance America Inc (New York), X L America Inc (Delaware) for Indian Harbor Insurance Co; Corporate Parents, Zurich Insurance Co Ltd, Zurich Insurance Group Ltd, Zurich American Insurance Co, Zurich Holding Co of America Inc for Steadfast Insurance Co; Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corp for Old Republic Union Insurance Co; Corporate Parents, Safety National Casualty Corp,Tokyo Marine Holdings Inc for Safety Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Rew, Phillip) Modified on 1/4/2022 (Crick, S). (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Counterclaim. Country Club Pointe L L C answer due 2/3/2022; Vintage Realty Co L L C answer due 2/3/2022; granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings MOTION to Stay ( Responses due by 2/3/2022). Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/22/2021. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Counterclaim , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings MOTION to Stay. (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/21/2021.) by Country Club Pointe L L C, Vintage Realty Co L L C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Jones, Reid) Modified on 12/21/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC ORDER re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings MOTION to Stay filed by Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, H D I Global Specialty S E, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, Steadfast Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co, Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings MOTION to Stay :( Responses due by 1/3/2022, Replies due by 1/10/2022.). Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/20/2021. (crt,Petrofes, T) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EXHIBIT re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings Table of Contents and Table of Authorities by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Rew, Phillip) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Transferred regarding #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings MOTION to Stay., Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings MOTION to Stay.(Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/16/2021.) Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit 1-Case law, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Rew, Phillip) Modified on 12/17/2021 to indicate #8 Table of Contents submitted as separate document. (Crick, S). Added MOTION to Stay on 12/17/2021 (Crick, S). (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/16/2021. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/15/2021. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Phillip J Rew, Bruce R Hoefer, Jr, D Russell Holwadel, Heather England Reznik, Kyle Matthew Truxillo, Richard R Stedman, II, Melanie Helaine Melasky on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/29/2021. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT against Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co filed by Vintage Realty Co L L C, Country Club Pointe L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #2 to #1 Notice of Removal.(crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketDIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 1:21-cv-4300 from Alexandria Division to Lake Charles Division. New Case Number 2:21-cv-4300. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Vintage Realty Co L L C, Country Club Pointe L L C by Steadfast Insurance Co, H I Global Specialty S E, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Severally Subscribing to Certificate No AMR-59283-03, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co.(Attorney Phillip J Rew added to party General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona(pty:dft), Indian Harbor Insurance Co(pty:dft), Lexington Insurance Co(pty:dft), Old Republic Union Insurance Co(pty:dft), Q B E Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft), Safety Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft), Steadfast Insurance Co(pty:dft), United Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Rew, Phillip) Modified on 12/15/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2021-3796 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4928712) filed by HDI Global Specialty SE, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - Arbitration Clause, #4 Exhibit C - Policy, #5 Exhibit Consents)(Attorney Phillip J Rew added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J Rew added to party HDI Global Specialty SE(pty:dft))(aty,Rew, Phillip) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GENERAL SECURITY AND INDEMNITY is a litigant

Latest cases where Steadfast Insurance Company aso H & M Hennes & Ma is a litigant

Latest cases where SAFETY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant