This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/11/2022 at 12:55:41 (UTC).

Vining v. Ninebot U.S., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On August 12, 2022, John K. Vining, (“Plaintiff”), represented by William J. Price of Elk & Elk Co., Ltd., filed a personal injury lawsuit against Ninebot U.S., Inc., Segway, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC, and Amazon Logistics, Inc. (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking declaratory relief and compensatory damages for the alleged personal injury caused due to negligence and wrongful conduct in manufacturing and distributing its MiniPRO. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Texas with Judges James L. Graham and Chelsey M. Vascura presiding. 

In the complaint, the plaintiff claimed, “Defendant Segway has designed, manufactured and supplied its MiniPRO products to Defendant Ninebot in the United States.”

Plaintiff also claimed that “MiniPROs have a model number of N3M260. The MiniPRO's serial number is N3MSA1734T0722.”

The plaintiff then alleged, “Defendant Segway sells its products to consumers and retailers, such as Defendant Ninebot, throughout the United States, including Ohio, who in turn sells them to customers.”

Plaintiff also alleged that “Plaintiff John K. Vining lost his balance, flew forward off the MiniPRO and faceplanted. He landed on his left wrist, left hand, left knee, and sustained fractures to multiple bones in his face, requiring surgery.”

The plaintiff also alleged, “[a]s a direct and proximate result of Defendants Segway and Ninebot's negligence and wrongful conduct in, inter alia, manufacturing and distributing its MiniPRO, and the unreasonably dangerous and defective characteristics of Defendants Segway and Ninebot's MiniPRO, Plaintiff John K. Vining suffered physical injury and bodily impairment, including but not limited to, lacerations and contusions, conscious pain and suffering, and economic losses, physical injuries, and emotional distress.”

Additionally, Plaintiff alleged that “[a]s a direct and proximate result of Plaintiff's use of the MiniPRO and Plaintiff John K. Vining's injuries, Plaintiff John K. Vining suffered damages and harm, including but not limited to, medical expenses and other harm.”

Plaintiff then alleged that “Defendant Ninebot should have known that consumers, such as Plaintiff John K. Vining, would foreseeably suffer injury as a result of Amazon’s failure to exercise reasonable care.”

Plaintiff also alleged that “[a]s a direct and proximate result of Plaintiff's use of MiniPRO as manufactured, designed, sold, supplied and introduced into the stream of commerce by Defendant Ninebot, Plaintiff John K. Vining suffered personal injury, economic and non-economic damages, and will continue to suffer such harm, damages, and economic loss in the future.”

Plaintiffs presented fourteen claims for relief, including for alleged strict liability due to defect in design or formulation, defective manufacturing, and inadequate warning. Other claims presented by the plaintiff included negligence, breach of implied and express warranties for fitness, claim of consortium, and punitive damage claims for Defendants that “knew or should have known of the dangerous propensity of the MiniPRO in foreseeable conditions.” 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff requested a judgement for declaratory relief, and an award in excess of $75,000, and other damages in an amount to be determined by a jury according to law, attorneys' fees, and costs of litigation. 

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-03105

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James L. Graham

Referral Judge

Chelsey M. Vascura

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John K. Vining

Linda Vining

Defendants

Ninebot U.S., Inc.

Segway, Inc.

John Doe Corporation 1-3

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William J Price

Attorney at Elk & Elk Co., Ltd.

6105 Parkland Blvd., Suite 200

Mayfield Heights, OH 44124

Defendant Attorney

Joseph Frederick Butcher

Attorney at Zimmer Kunz PLLC

Grant Bldg, 310 Grant St

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Amazon.com Services LLC (7020 0090 0002 2254 6429) & Amazon Logistics Inc (7020 0090 0002 2254 6436) served on 9/19/2022. Both Defendants terminated on 8/29/2022. (vb) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT SEGWAY, INC. TO PLEAD, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT by Defendant Segway, Inc.. (Butcher, Joseph) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Frederick Butcher for Defendant Segway, Inc. (Butcher, Joseph) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Segway, Inc.. Segway, Inc. served on 9/8/2022, answer due 9/29/2022. (er) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed: Ninebot U.S., Inc. served on 9/3/2022, answer due 9/26/2022. (er) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Segway, Inc. (7019 2280 0000 1912 8271) Served on 8/30/2022, Answer due 9/20/2022. (vb) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC. (Party Termed 8/29/2022) (er) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk to Segway, Inc.(7020 1810 0001 5860 4326) & Ninebot U.S. Inc.(7020 1810 0001 5860 4319). A copy of the Complaint & issued Summons was sent vial certified mail. (vb) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

7 #1

Tracking History (8400)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Ninebot U.S., Inc. Ninebot U.S., Inc. served on 8/25/2022, answer due 9/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Tracking History (8400)) (tla) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

6 #1

Summons Form

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Ninebot U.S., Inc., Segway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (ds) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

5 #2

Summons Form Segway, Inc.

5 #1

Summons Form Ninebot U.S. Inc.

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ninebot U.S., Inc., Segway, Inc., filed by John K. Vining. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form Ninebot U.S. Inc., #2 Summons Form Segway, Inc.) (Price, William) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons were sent to the named defendants via certified mail. (er) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

3 #4

Summons as to Amazon Logistics, Inc.

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Segway, Inc., #2 Summons as to Amazon Services, LLC, #3 Summons as to Amazon Services, LLC c/o Corp Services, #4 Summons as to Amazon Logistics, Inc.) (tla) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

17 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Amazon.com Services LLC (7020 0090 0002 2254 6429) & Amazon Logistics Inc (7020 0090 0002 2254 6436) served on 9/19/2022. Both Defendants terminated on 8/29/2022. (vb) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT SEGWAY, INC. TO PLEAD, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT by Defendant Segway, Inc.. (Butcher, Joseph) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Frederick Butcher for Defendant Segway, Inc. (Butcher, Joseph) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Segway, Inc.. Segway, Inc. served on 9/8/2022, answer due 9/29/2022. (er) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed: Ninebot U.S., Inc. served on 9/3/2022, answer due 9/26/2022. (er) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Segway, Inc. (7019 2280 0000 1912 8271) Served on 8/30/2022, Answer due 9/20/2022. (vb) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC. (Party Termed 8/29/2022) (er) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk to Segway, Inc.(7020 1810 0001 5860 4326) & Ninebot U.S. Inc.(7020 1810 0001 5860 4319). A copy of the Complaint & issued Summons was sent vial certified mail. (vb) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Ninebot U.S., Inc. Ninebot U.S., Inc. served on 8/25/2022, answer due 9/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Tracking History (8400)) (tla) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Ninebot U.S., Inc., Segway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (ds) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ninebot U.S., Inc., Segway, Inc., filed by John K. Vining. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form Ninebot U.S. Inc., #2 Summons Form Segway, Inc.) (Price, William) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons were sent to the named defendants via certified mail. (er) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Segway, Inc., #2 Summons as to Amazon Services, LLC, #3 Summons as to Amazon Services, LLC c/o Corp Services, #4 Summons as to Amazon Logistics, Inc.) (tla) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a notice within FOURTEEN DAYS identifying Defendant Amazon Services.com LLC's members (and sub-members, if applicable) and facts sufficient for the Court to determine the citizenship of those members. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 8/15/2022. (daf) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: BOHSDC-9002214), filed by john vining. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Summons Ninebot, #3 Summons Form Summons Segway, #4 Summons Form Summons Amazon.com, #5 Summons Form Summons Amazon.com, #6 Summons Form Summon Amazon Logistics) (Price, William) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less