This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/11/2021 at 09:55:40 (UTC).

Vincent v. Syngenta AG et al

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 Vincent filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Syngenta AG. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra M. Brown and Jane M. Virden. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00131

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Debra M. Brown

Referral Judge

Jane M. Virden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott Vincent

Defendants

Syngenta AG

Sygenta Crop Protection AG

Syngenta Corporation

Syngenta Crop Protection LLC

Chevron Corporation

Phillips 66

Chevron USA, Inc.

Phillips 66 Company

Chevron Phillips Chemical Company LLC

Chevron Phillips Chemical Company LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John L. Davidson

Attorney at DDAVIDSON BOWIE, PLLC

1062 Highland Colony Parkwaysuite 275

Ridgeland, MS 39157

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by John L. Davidson on behalf of Scott Vincent Chevron Phillips Chemical Company LLC served on 11/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Proof of Service) (Davidson, John)

3 #1

Affidavit Proof of Service

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by John L. Davidson on behalf of Scott Vincent Syngenta Corporation served on 11/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Proof of Service) (Davidson, John)

4 #1

Affidavit Proof of Service

#5

(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection LLC, Chevron Corporation, Phillips 66, Chevron USA, Inc., Phillips 66 Company, and Chevron Phillips Chemical Company LP (jla)

#6

(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Chevron Phillips Chemical Company LLC (jla)

#7

(#7) MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case Transferred to District of Southern Illinois via ECF. CASE CLOSED. (jla)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketRemark: Case transferred from Mississippi Northern has been opened in Southern District of Illinois as case 3:21-pq-01540, filed 12/02/2021. (jtm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case Transferred to District of Southern Illinois via ECF. CASE CLOSED. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Chevron Phillips Chemical Company LLC (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection LLC, Chevron Corporation, Phillips 66, Chevron USA, Inc., Phillips 66 Company, and Chevron Phillips Chemical Company LP (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by John L. Davidson on behalf of Scott Vincent Syngenta Corporation served on 11/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Proof of Service) (Davidson, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by John L. Davidson on behalf of Scott Vincent Chevron Phillips Chemical Company LLC served on 11/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Proof of Service) (Davidson, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2011606, filed by Scott Vincent. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Syngenta Crop Protection L L C is a litigant

Latest cases where Syngenta, AG is a litigant

Latest cases where CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL COMPANY LP is a litigant

Latest cases where PHILLIP 66 COMPANY is a litigant