This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/29/2021 at 07:51:53 (UTC).

VINCENT v. COMCAST CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 VINCENT filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against COMCAST CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY R. RICE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06017

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TIMOTHY R. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRACIE VINCENT

Defendants

COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS MANAGEMENT, LLC

COMCAST CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATHERINE OELTJEN

Attorney at CONSOLE MATTIACCI LAW, LLC

1525 Locust Street, Ninth Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorney

PAUL C. EVANS

Attorney at BAKER MCKENZIE LLP

452 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10018

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER THAT ALL DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 6/21/21; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 1/20/21. 1/20/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL C. EVANS on behalf of COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS MANAGEMENT, LLC, COMCAST CORPORATION (EVANS, PAUL) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#6

(#6) CONSENT AND ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY RICE TO CONDUCT ALL PROCEEDINGS AND ORDER THE ENTRY OF A FINAL CONFERENCE WITH 28 U.S.C.&636 (c) AND FED.R.CIV.P.73; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 1/19/21. 1/19/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#5

(#5) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by TRACIE VINCENT.. (OELTJEN, KATHERINE) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TRACIE VINCENT. COMCAST CORPORATION waiver sent on 12/3/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (OELTJEN, KATHERINE) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TRACIE VINCENT. COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS MANAGEMENT, LLC waiver sent on 12/3/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (OELTJEN, KATHERINE) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 12/3/2020. 12/9/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS MANAGEMENT, LLC, COMCAST CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14746462.), filed by TRACIE VINCENT.(OELTJEN, KATHERINE) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER THAT ALL DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 6/21/21; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 1/20/21. 1/20/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE Pretrial Conference held on 1/19/21. (JL ) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL C. EVANS on behalf of COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS MANAGEMENT, LLC, COMCAST CORPORATION (EVANS, PAUL) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT AND ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY RICE TO CONDUCT ALL PROCEEDINGS AND ORDER THE ENTRY OF A FINAL CONFERENCE WITH 28 U.S.C.&636 (c) AND FED.R.CIV.P.73; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 1/19/21. 1/19/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by TRACIE VINCENT.. (OELTJEN, KATHERINE) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TRACIE VINCENT. COMCAST CORPORATION waiver sent on 12/3/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (OELTJEN, KATHERINE) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TRACIE VINCENT. COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS MANAGEMENT, LLC waiver sent on 12/3/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (OELTJEN, KATHERINE) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 12/3/2020. 12/9/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS MANAGEMENT, LLC, COMCAST CORPORATION. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 12/1/20 (JL ) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by TRACIE VINCENT. (JL ) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS MANAGEMENT, LLC, COMCAST CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14746462.), filed by TRACIE VINCENT.(OELTJEN, KATHERINE) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Comcast Cable Communications, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COMCAST CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAUL C. EVANS(Designation Retained)