This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/08/2022 at 07:41:35 (UTC).

Vincent v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 Vincent filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Sean P. Flynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-00059

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathryn Kimball Mizelle

Referral Judge

Sean P. Flynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patrick E Vincent

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David P. Matthews

Richard Arthur Freese

Defendant Attorneys

Sabrina R. Gallo

Alexandra Bach Lagos

Matthew B. Lerner

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew B. Lerner on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C. R. Bard Incorporated (Lerner, Matthew) Modified on 2/11/2022 to edit text (CRK). (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#24

(#24) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery opens on 2/15/2022. Deadline for Plaintiff to produce MDL fact sheet is 3/25/2022. Deadline for Defendant to produce MDL fact sheet is 4/26/2022. Discovery due by 2/24/2023. Dispositive motions due by 3/27/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2023 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 13B before Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle. Jury Trial set for November 2023 in Tampa Courtroom 13B before Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 2/8/2022. (JMB) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

23 #2

Exhibit Stipulation and Filing

23 #1

Exhibit Statem of Remand

#23

(#23) STATUS report (JOINT) by C. R. Bard Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statem of Remand, #2 Exhibit Stipulation and Filing)(Bach Lagos, Alexandra) Modified on 1/27/2022 to edit text (CRK). (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#22

(#22) ORDER: The parties shall file their joint status report on or before January 26, 2022, as described in more detail in the Order. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 1/12/2022. (JMB) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Bach Lagos on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Bach Lagos, Alexandra) Modified on 1/12/2022 to edit text (CRK). (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#20

(#20) ORDER re Joint Status Report and Statement Regarding Venue and Citizenship as to Patrick Vincent, with directions to the Clerk to open his case in the Tampa Division. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 12/30/2021. (Originally filed in 3:21-mc-31-TJC)(LRB) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#19

(#19) JOINT Status Report and Statement Regarding Venue and Citizenship (Originally filed in 3:21-mc-31-TJC) (LRB) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

8 #1

*Restricted*

#8

(#8) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-03807. File received electronically (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#7

(#7) AMENDED FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/26/21. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 1/7/2022.] (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#6

(#6) *AMENDED by Doc. #7*FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/20/21. (MAP) *Modified on 4/29/2021 (SJF). [Transferred from azd on 1/7/2022.] (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#5

(#5) AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 50 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated (see Doc. 22012-2). The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Full Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/15/21. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 1/7/2022.] (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#4

(#4) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 50 - (1) The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated (see Doc. 22012-2). The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Full Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/14/21. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 1/7/2022.] (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#3

(#3) *VACATED By Doc. #4*ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 20902 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 11/20/19. (MAP) *Modified on 4/14/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 1/7/2022.] (Entered: 11/22/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16162082 filed by Patrick E Vincent. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 1/7/2022.] (Entered: 11/06/2018)

201 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew B. Lerner on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C. R. Bard Incorporated (Lerner, Matthew) Modified on 2/11/2022 to edit text (CRK). (Entered: 02/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery opens on 2/15/2022. Deadline for Plaintiff to produce MDL fact sheet is 3/25/2022. Deadline for Defendant to produce MDL fact sheet is 4/26/2022. Discovery due by 2/24/2023. Dispositive motions due by 3/27/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2023 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 13B before Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle. Jury Trial set for November 2023 in Tampa Courtroom 13B before Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 2/8/2022. (JMB) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) STATUS report (JOINT) by C. R. Bard Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statem of Remand, #2 Exhibit Stipulation and Filing)(Bach Lagos, Alexandra) Modified on 1/27/2022 to edit text (CRK). (Entered: 01/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) ORDER: The parties shall file their joint status report on or before January 26, 2022, as described in more detail in the Order. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 1/12/2022. (JMB) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Bach Lagos on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Bach Lagos, Alexandra) Modified on 1/12/2022 to edit text (CRK). (Entered: 01/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) ORDER re Joint Status Report and Statement Regarding Venue and Citizenship as to Patrick Vincent, with directions to the Clerk to open his case in the Tampa Division. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 12/30/2021. (Originally filed in 3:21-mc-31-TJC)(LRB) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) JOINT Status Report and Statement Regarding Venue and Citizenship (Originally filed in 3:21-mc-31-TJC) (LRB) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) ORDER directing the parties to confer and file one joint statement per case regarding venue, including the specific divisions. Defendant's counsel is responsible to ensure that the responses are docketed in CM/ECF in miscellaneous case 3:21-mc-31-TJC as directed. See order for further detail. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 5/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Final Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit B - List of Cases)(Originally filed in 3:21-mc-31-TJC)(LRB) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) EXHIBIT to pertinent filings from MDL docket, Order on Motions in Limine (Attachments: #1 Doc 9775, #2 Doc 9861, #3 Doc 9881, #4 Doc 10075, #5 Doc 10235, #6 Doc 10258, #7 Doc 10382, #8 Doc 10489, #9 Doc 10819, #10 Doc 10920, #11 Doc 10947, #12 Doc 11041, #13 Doc 11082, #14 Doc 11256, #15 Doc 12507, #16 Doc 12533, #17 Doc 17285, #18 Doc 17401)(LRB) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) EXHIBIT to pertinent filings from MDL docket, Orders on Discovery and Privilege (Attachments: #1 Doc 314, #2 Doc 699, #3 Doc 2813, #4 Doc 4865, #5 Doc 6799, #6 Doc 8113, #7 Doc 8315)(LRB) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
01/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) PERTINENT Filings from MDL Docket (Attachments: #1 MDL abbreviated docket sheet omitting parties and counsel, #2 Transfer Order, Doc #22042)(LRB) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-03807. File received electronically (Entered: 01/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/06/2021

DocketRemark: Transferring Case to the Middle District of Florida via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 1/7/2022.] (Entered: 05/06/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) AMENDED FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/26/21. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 1/7/2022.] (Entered: 04/28/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) *AMENDED by Doc. #7*FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/20/21. (MAP) *Modified on 4/29/2021 (SJF). [Transferred from azd on 1/7/2022.] (Entered: 04/28/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 50 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated (see Doc. 22012-2). The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Full Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/15/21. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 1/7/2022.] (Entered: 04/26/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 50 - (1) The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated (see Doc. 22012-2). The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Full Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/14/21. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 1/7/2022.] (Entered: 04/14/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) *VACATED By Doc. #4*ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 20902 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 11/20/19. (MAP) *Modified on 4/14/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 1/7/2022.] (Entered: 11/22/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2018

Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-3807-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 1/7/2022.] (Entered: 11/06/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16162082 filed by Patrick E Vincent. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 1/7/2022.] (Entered: 11/06/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less