This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:29:51 (UTC).

VINCENT v. AMERICAN DREAM HOME GOODS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 VINCENT filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against AMERICAN DREAM HOME GOODS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Esther Salas and Steven C. Mannion. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-21077

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Esther Salas

Referral Judge

Steven C. Mannion

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIA VINCENT

Defendants

JIANYING WANG

AMERICAN DREAM HOME GOODS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREW I. GLENN

Attorney at JAFFE GLENN LAW GROUP PA

301 N Harrison St, Ste 9F, #306

Princeton, NJ 08540

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Change of Address by ANDREW I. GLENN (GLENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMERICAN DREAM HOME GOODS, INC., JIANYING WANG. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AMERICAN DREAM HOME GOODS, INC., JIANYING WANG ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10157665) with JURY DEMAND, filed by KIA VINCENT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(GLENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Change of Address by ANDREW I. GLENN (GLENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMERICAN DREAM HOME GOODS, INC., JIANYING WANG. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketJudge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion added. (ps, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AMERICAN DREAM HOME GOODS, INC., JIANYING WANG ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10157665) with JURY DEMAND, filed by KIA VINCENT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(GLENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.