This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2020 at 08:04:58 (UTC).

Vincent G. Dimaggio v. Jacqueline L. Stoever

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 Vincent G Dimaggio filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Jacqueline L Stoever. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert C. Jones and Carla Baldwin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00029

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert C. Jones

Referral Judge

Carla Baldwin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vincent G Dimaggio

Defendants

Does 1-10

Jacqueline L Stoever

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael N Sofris

Attorney at Michael N Sofris Law Offices

468 North Camden Drive Suite 200

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Defendant Attorneys

William E. Peterson

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer, L.L.P.

50 West Liberty Street, Suite 510

Reno, NV 89501

Patricia Brum

Attorney at Snell and Wilmer LLP

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#28

#27

#24

21 #1

*Restricted*

#21

#20

10 #9

Proposed Order

10 #5

Exhibit C to Stoever Decl

10 #4

Exhibit B to Stoever Decl

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Exhibit Summons and Complaint

#2

#1

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER granting ECF No. #27 Stipulation to Vacate Case Management Conference Pending Settlement. Stipulation for Dismissal due by 3/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) STIPULATION and Order to Vacate Case Management Conference Pending Settlement re #24 Minute Order Setting Hearing,,, by Defendant Jacqueline L Stoever. (Peterson, William) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • Docket(#26) 2nd NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Patricia Brum to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/16/2020. (no image attached) (LE) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • Docket(#25) 2nd NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Michael N. Sofris to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/16/2020. (no image attached) (LE) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 2/14/2020. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. A telephonic case management conference is set for 3/17/2020 at 09:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. Counsel shall dial 877-336-1829 at least five (5) minutes prior to the hearing to be properly connected into the courtroom. The access code is 2809752 and the security code is 2029. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Report by no later than the close of business on Tuesday, March 10, 2020. See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM) Modified on 2/14/2020 to include the dial-in information for the hearing & resent to counsel.(LGM) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Patricia Brum to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/1/2020. (no image attached) (LE) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Michael N Sofris to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/1/2020. (no image attached) (LE) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (LE) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-09568. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received with documents numbers 1-20, received electronically. (DRM) Modified on 1/16/2020 for font (DRM). (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (DE #10 ) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court GRANTS in part Defendant's Motion and transfers this action to the District of Nevada. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) Case transferred electronically. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 1/16/2020.] (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Mediation filed by Defendant Jacqueline L. Stoever. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brum, Patricia) [Transferred from California Central on 1/16/2020.] (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) [Transferred from California Central on 1/16/2020.] (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09568 RGK(SSx). (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 1/16/2020.] (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jacqueline L. Stoever answer now due 11/25/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by defendant Jacqueline L. Stoever.(Brum, Patricia) [Transferred from California Central on 1/16/2020.] (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 1/16/2020.] (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 1/16/2020.] (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Jacqueline L. Stoever, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Vincent G. Dimaggio. (filed in state court 10/2/19, submitted as document 2, attachment 1) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 1/16/2020.] (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice Interested Parties filed by Defendant Jacqueline L. Stoever (Brum, Patricia) [Transferred from California Central on 1/16/2020.] (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19SMCV01736 Receipt No: 0973-24744498 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Jacqueline L. Stoever. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint) (Attorney Patricia Brum added to party Jacqueline L. Stoever(pty:dft))(Brum, Patricia) [Transferred from California Central on 1/16/2020.] (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Jacqueline L. Stoever. (Brum, Patricia) [Transferred from California Central on 1/16/2020.] (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patricia Brum

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William E. Peterson