This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/21/2021 at 09:24:09 (UTC).

Vincent et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/23/2020 Vincent filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Boston Scientific Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are D. P. Marshall Jr. and James M. Moody Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00417

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

D. P. Marshall Jr.

James M. Moody Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Barbara G Vincent

Barry C Vincent

Defendant

Boston Scientific Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey Kuntz

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell LLP

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Sean T. Keith

Attorney at Keith Law Group

5050 West Northgate Road, Suite 108

Rogers, AR 72758

Defendant Attorneys

Eric M. Anielak

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P.

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

A. Bradley Bodamer

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P.

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

Jon Strongman

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P.

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

Michael Bonasso

Attorney at Flaherty Sensabaugh & Bonasso

48 Donley Street, Suite 501

Morgantown, WV 26501

Michele On-Ja Choe

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLC

370 Seventeenth Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202

Andrew H. Myers

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLC

370 Seventeenth Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202

Michael A. Tanenbaum

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale

Three Gateway Center, Suite 1301, 100 Mulberry Street

Newark, NJ 07102

Bryan Pratt

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P.

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

Matthew D. Keenan

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P.

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

Eva M. Weiler

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P.

5 Park Plaza, Suite 1600

Irvine, CA 92614-2546

Lindsey M. Saad

Attorney at Flaherty Sensabaugh & Bonasso

48 Donley Street, Suite 501

Morgantown, WV 26501

James H. Keale

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale

Three Gateway Center, Suite 1301, 100 Mulberry Street

Newark, NJ 07102

Steven D. Soden

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P.

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

Robert T. Adams

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P.

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

Tarifa Belle Laddon

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

1800 Century Park East, Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Andrew G. Jackson

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Wells Fargo Center - Suite 2200, 90 South Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-3901

Lyn Peeples Pruitt

Attorney at Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard, P.L.L.C.

425 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 1800

Little Rock, AR 72201

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

86 #1

Exhibit(s) A

49 #9

Exhibit(s) I

49 #7

Exhibit(s) G

49 #6

Exhibit(s) F

49 #4

Exhibit(s) D

49 #3

Exhibit(s) C

49 #2

Exhibit(s) B

49 #1

Exhibit(s) A

47 #1

Exhibit(s) A-K

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

636 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#167) ORDER denying #47 , #49 , #86 , #107 , #108 , and #109 Motions without prejudice to refile in accordance with the deadlines set by the Court in this case. If the parties contend that any previously filed motion was untimely according to the scheduling order issued by the MDL, those arguments can be made upon refiling. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/12/2021. (jak) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#166) ORDER granting #163 & #164 motions to appear pro hac vice. Andrew G. Jackson and Tarifa B. Laddon are hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/7/2021. (jak) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#165) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #162 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys A. Bradley Bodamer; Michael Bonasso; Michele On-Ja Choe; James H. Keale; Matthew D. Keenan; Andrew H. Myers; Bryan Pratt; Lindsey M. Saad; Steven D. Soden; Jon Strongman; Michael A. Tanenbaum; Eva M. Weiler; Robert T. Adams and Eric M. Anielak terminated. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/7/2021. (amr) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#164) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Tarifa B. Laddon. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3905400. Filed by Boston Scientific Corporation (Pruitt, Lyn) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#163) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Andrew G. Jackson. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3905394. Filed by Boston Scientific Corporation (Pruitt, Lyn) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#162) MOTION to Substitute Attorney MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOLLOWING REMAND by Boston Scientific Corporation (Pruitt, Lyn) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#161) NOTICE of Appearance by Lyn Peeples Pruitt on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (Pruitt, Lyn) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#160) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #159 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge James M. Moody Jr. (jak) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#159) ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to reassign this case to Judge Moody as it is related to 4:20-cv-1049 JM. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/30/2020. (jak) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#158) Case electronically transferred in from the U.S. District Court, Southern District of West Virginia; Case Number 2:13-cv-08669. Electronic file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
148 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PRETRIAL ORDER # 100 (Docket Control Order on Wave 1 and Wave 2 Discovery) Directing that the Plaintiffs and Boston Scientific Corporation (BSC) commence discovery on 200 cases; setting forth more fully herein the criteria, deadlines, and other requirements that will govern the selection and discovery of Wave 1 and Wave 2 cases, including: each side selected 50 Wave 1 cases on 1/21/2014; each side will select 50 Wave 2 cases by 5/21/2014; Plaintiff Fact Sheets and executed authorizations for Wave 1 cases were due 2/17/2014; Plaintiff Fact Sheets and executed authorizations for Wave 2 cases due 6/19/2014; Defendant Fact Sheets for Wave 1 cases were due 3/21/2014; BSC's Defendant Fact Sheets for Wave 2 cases due 7/14/2014; discovery outlined in PTO # 65 due 8/4/2014 for Wave 1 cases and 10/3/2014 for Wave 2 cases; depositions of explanting physicians due in Wave 1 and 2 cases due 10/3/2014; additional discovery outside of PTO # 65 due 1/5/2015; plaintiffs' expert disclosures and reports due 10/29/2014; plaintiffs to provide two dates between 1/13/2014 and 12/17/2014 upon which expert witnesses may be deposed; BSC's expert disclosures and reports due 11/10/2014; BSC to provide two dates between 12/7/2014 and 1/12/2015 upon which expert witnesses may be deposed; disclosures and reports for expert witnesses due 12/22/2014; discovery to be completed by 1/12/2015; dispositive motions due 1/9/2015, opposition due 1/23/2015, replies due 1/30/2015; parties to confer and submit venue recommendations by 7/25/2014; a case to be tried in USDC/WVS to be deemed trial-ready by 1/30/2015; trial date for cases transferred or remanded to other federal district courts to be set by the judge to whom the transferred or remanded case is assigned; the Clerk will file a copy of this order in 2:12-md-2326 and in the cases that have been designated by the parties as Wave 1 and Wave 2 cases. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/27/2014. (cc: Clerk of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; attys) (REF: MDL 2326; Wave 1 Cases; Wave 2 Cases) (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 05/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CROSS-NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Barbara G. Vincent, Barry C. Vincent of Mark Stripling, M.D. on 05/15/2014 at 7:00 a.m. (Keith, Sean) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 05/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Mark Stripling, M.D. on May 15, 2014 at 7:00 a.m. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 04/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Barry Vincent on May 14, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 04/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Barbara Vincent on May 13, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 04/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Jon A. Strongman/Partner on 06/11/2013. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver mailed on 5/23/2013, answer due 7/22/2013. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 06/21/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 06/21/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 05/02/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 44 (SHOW CAUSE ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF COLOPLAST A/S, COLOPLAST MANUFACTURING US, LLC AND PORGES S.A.) entered on 04/19/2013 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A) (jap) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 04/23/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt # 0425-2367532. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mmw) [Transferred from wvsd on 12/23/2020.] (Entered: 04/23/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boston Scientific Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean T. Keith

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Kuntz