This case was last updated from PACER on 04/20/2021 at 10:22:52 (UTC).

VINCA v. MONDELEZ INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 VINCA filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against MONDELEZ INTERNATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Edward S. Kiel and Claire C. Cecchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03034

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Edward S. Kiel

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUHAMET VINCA

Defendants

JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10

XYZ CORP. 1-10

MONDELEZ GLOBAL, LLC

MONDELEZ INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUDY A. DERMESROPIAN

Attorney at RUDY A. DERMESROPIAN, LLC

729 Seventh Avenue, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MUHAMET VINCA. MONDELEZ INTERNATIONAL, INC. waiver sent on 3/11/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (DERMESROPIAN, RUDY) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MUHAMET VINCA. MONDELEZ GLOBAL, LLC waiver sent on 3/11/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (DERMESROPIAN, RUDY) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to MONDELEZ GLOBAL, LLC, MONDELEZ INTERNATIONAL, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (JB, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Summons Proposed Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10, MONDELEZ GLOBAL, LLC, MONDELEZ INTERNATIONAL, INC., XYZ CORP. 1-10 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12155583) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MUHAMET VINCA. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(DERMESROPIAN, RUDY) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MUHAMET VINCA. MONDELEZ INTERNATIONAL, INC. waiver sent on 3/11/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (DERMESROPIAN, RUDY) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MUHAMET VINCA. MONDELEZ GLOBAL, LLC waiver sent on 3/11/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (DERMESROPIAN, RUDY) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to MONDELEZ GLOBAL, LLC, MONDELEZ INTERNATIONAL, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (JB, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketJudge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10, MONDELEZ GLOBAL, LLC, MONDELEZ INTERNATIONAL, INC., XYZ CORP. 1-10 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12155583) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MUHAMET VINCA. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(DERMESROPIAN, RUDY) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONDELEZ INTERNATIONAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mondelez Global LLC Group Benefits Plan. the is a litigant

Latest cases where XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rudy Artin Dermesropian