This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/08/2021 at 20:45:48 (UTC).

Villella et al v. Logan et al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 Villella filed an Other lawsuit against Logan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent L. Briccetti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-09905

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vincent L. Briccetti

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Richard O. Villella

Nelsonville, NY 10516

Courtney S. Tarpley

Nelsonville, NY 10516

Michael I. Olshakoski

Nelsonville, NY 10516

Rosemarie Olshakoski

Nelsonville, NY 10516

Jeff Rossi

Nelsonville, NY 10516

Melissa Gillmer

Nelsonville, NY 10516

Defendants

New Cingular Wireless PCD LLC d/b/a AT&T doing business as AT&T

Homeland Towers, LLC

Douglas W. Logan

NEW YORK SMSA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP d/b/a/ VERIZON WIRELESS doing business as Verizon Wireless

New Cingular Wireless PCD LLC doing business as AT&T

New York SMSA Limited Partnership doing business as Verizon Wireless

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark William Blanchard

Attorney at City of Yonkers Office of The Corporation Counsel(Law Dept.)

40 South Broadway, Room 300

Yonkers, NY 10701

Kristin Rose Pelatti

Attorney at MarksDiPalermo, PLLC

235 Main Street, Ste 330

White Plains, NY 10601

Michael Vincent Caruso

Attorney at Michael V. Caruso, P.C.

3871 Danbury Road, 10509

Brewster, NY 10509

Robert A. Weis

Attorney at The Law Firm of William G. Sayegh, P.C.,

65 Gleneida Avenue

Carmel, NY 10512

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Dominick Gaudioso

Attorney at Snyder & Snyder, LLP

94 White Plains Road

Tarrytown, NY 10591

Carlotta Cassidy-Young

Attorney at Snyder & Snyder, LLP

94 White Plains Road

Tarrytown, NY 10591

Mark E. Constantine

Attorney at Mark Constantine, Esq.

106 North Broadway

Irvington, NY 10533

 

Court Documents

#34

#20

19 #5

Mem of Law

19 #4

Signed TRO

19 #3

Affirmation in Support of TRO

19 #2

Summons and Complaint

19 #1

Stipulation of Settlement

#19

#18

1 #10

Exhibit D

1 #9

Exhibit C

1 #8

Exhibit B-4

1 #7

Exhibit B-3

1 #6

Exhibit B-2

1 #5

Exhibit B-1

1 #2

Exhibit A-2

1 #1

Exhibit A-1

#1

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) FIRST REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #19 MOTION to Remand ., #20 MOTION to Remand ., #18 MOTION to Remand . . Document filed by Courtney S. Tarpley, Richard O. Villella..(Pelatti, Kristin) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) REPLY AFFIRMATION of Mark W. Blanchard in Support re: #20 MOTION to Remand ., #19 MOTION to Remand ., #18 MOTION to Remand .. Document filed by Courtney S. Tarpley, Richard O. Villella. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1A & 1B Orders to Show Cause, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2- Consent Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3A & 3B- Complaints, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4- Stipulation, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5- Letter to Village of Nelsonville Nov 17, 2017, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6- Letter to Village of Nelsonville Nov 27, 2017, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7- Brief, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8- Cascade Title Report, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9- Memo of Law in Opposition to Motion to Intervene).(Pelatti, Kristin) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristin Rose Pelatti on behalf of Courtney S. Tarpley, Richard O. Villella..(Pelatti, Kristin) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER granting #30 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document: Defendants Homeland Towers, LLC, and New York SMSA Limited Partnership are granted leave to file a CD exhibit with the Court. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (mjl) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit - CD containing audio recording addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Carlotta Cassidy dated January 20, 2021. Document filed by Homeland Towers, LLC, New York SMSA Limited Partnership..(Cassidy-Young, Carlotta) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) DECLARATION of Robert D. Gaudioso in Opposition re: #20 MOTION to Remand ., #19 MOTION to Remand ., #18 MOTION to Remand .. Document filed by Homeland Towers, LLC, New York SMSA Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-A & 1-B, Complaints from Prior Actions, #2 Exhibit 2, Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Intervene, #3 Exhibit 3, Memorandum Opinion and Order, #4 Exhibit 4, Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit 5, Audio Recording Filed in Tangible Form on CD with the Clerk's Office, #6 Exhibit 6, Minutes from January 21, 2020, #7 Exhibit 7, Stipulation of Settlement and Consent Order, #8 Exhibit 8, Building Permits, #9 Exhibit 9, Letter from USFWS, #10 Exhibit 10, Verified Complaint from 501477/2020, #11 Exhibit 11, Summons and Verified Complaint from 501481/2020, #12 Exhibit 12-A & 12-B, Orders to Show Cause, #13 Exhibit 13, Consolidation Stipulation, #14 Exhibit 14, Notice of Removal, #15 Exhibit 15, Complaint and Petition from 20-cv-8566).(Gaudioso, Robert) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #19 MOTION to Remand ., #20 MOTION to Remand ., #18 MOTION to Remand . . Document filed by Homeland Towers, LLC, New York SMSA Limited Partnership..(Gaudioso, Robert) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert A. Weis on behalf of Melissa Gillmer..(Weis, Robert) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert A. Weis on behalf of Jeff Rossi..(Weis, Robert) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER granting #24 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: Defendants opposition to the motion to remand is due on 1/15/2021; plaintiffs reply is due 1/29/2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (Briccetti, Vincent) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert Dominick Gaudioso to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Pursuant to ECF Filing Rule 13.3, Notice of Removal exhibits must be filed as attachments and labeled. Each attachment must be clearly titled in the ECF entry so the subject of the exhibit is clear. They cannot be labeled "Exhibit A, Exhibit B, etc.". Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert Dominick Gaudioso. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code (none). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1331. (sj) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert Dominick Gaudioso. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: New Cingular Wireless PCD LLC; New York SMSA Limited Partnership. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps. (sj) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Other Affiliate Bell Atlantic Mobile Systems LLC, Other Affiliate GTE Wireless LLC, Other Affiliate BAMS Communications LLC, Other Affiliate Verizon Americas LLC for NEW YORK SMSA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP d/b/a/ VERIZON WIRELESS. Document filed by NEW YORK SMSA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP d/b/a/ VERIZON WIRELESS..(Cassidy-Young, Carlotta) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Homeland Towers, LLC..(Cassidy-Young, Carlotta) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cassidy-Young, Carlotta) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carlotta Cassidy-Young on behalf of Homeland Towers, LLC, NEW YORK SMSA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP d/b/a/ VERIZON WIRELESS..(Cassidy-Young, Carlotta) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - EXHIBITS NOT CLEARLY TITLED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Putnam. Case Number: 501477/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22733790).Document filed by NEW YORK SMSA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP d/b/a/ VERIZON WIRELESS, Homeland Towers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit B-1, #6 Exhibit B-2, #7 Exhibit B-3, #8 Exhibit B-4, #9 Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit D, #11 Exhibit E).(Gaudioso, Robert) Modified on 11/25/2020 (sj). (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW YORK SMSA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP d/b/a/ VERIZON WIRELESS doing business as Verizon Wireless is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert D. Gaudioso