This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/23/2020 at 08:40:33 (UTC).

Luis Villegas v. Walmart Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 Luis Villegas filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Walmart Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-07677

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Luis Villegas

Defendants

DOES 1-10

Walmart Inc.

Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider

Frank Kaplan

Calabasas, CA 91302

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Russell C Handy

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorney

Andrew O Smith

Attorney at Pettit Kohn Ingrassia Lutz and Dolin PC

5901 Century Boulevard Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider Attorney

Frank Kaplan

5473 Collingwood Circle

Calabasas, CA 91302

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Frank Kaplan has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties request that the ADR Program assign a Panel Mediator from the following area of law: ADA. Filed by Plaintiff Luis Villegas(Montgomery, Elliott) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Granting #11 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation as to all parties. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than 12/20/2020. (gk) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Andrew O Smith added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft)) (Smith, Andrew) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Luis Villegas, upon Defendant Walmart Inc. served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process:Gabriela Sanchez- intake specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#8

(#8) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (cb) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Walmart Inc. (esa) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Luis Villegas. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Luis Villegas, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Luis Villegas. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27756390 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Luis Villegas. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Luis Villegas(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Frank Kaplan has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties request that the ADR Program assign a Panel Mediator from the following area of law: ADA. Filed by Plaintiff Luis Villegas(Montgomery, Elliott) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Granting #11 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation as to all parties. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than 12/20/2020. (gk) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Andrew O Smith added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft)) (Smith, Andrew) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Luis Villegas, upon Defendant Walmart Inc. served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process:Gabriela Sanchez- intake specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (cb) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Walmart Inc. (esa) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Luis Villegas. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Luis Villegas, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Luis Villegas. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27756390 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Luis Villegas. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Luis Villegas(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant