This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/23/2020 at 10:52:19 (UTC).

Villatoro v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/24/2020 Villatoro filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Home Depot U S A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shelly D. Dick and Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00400

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Villatoro

Defendant

Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Philip James Hunter

Attorney at Scott Law Firm

9270 Siegen Lane, Ste. 603

Baton Rouge, LA 70810

Flavia Rocha Moody

Attorney at The Scott Law Firm

9270 Siegen Lane, Ste. 603

Baton Rouge, LA 70810

James Andrew Spokes

Attorney at The Scott Law Firm

10636 Linkwood Court, Baton Rouge

Baton Rouge, LA 70810

Paul H. Scott

Attorney at The Scott Law Firm, LLC

10636 Linkwood Court

Baton Rouge, LA 70810

Defendant Attorneys

Lacresha Danielle Wilkerson

Attorney at Simon Peragine Smith & Redfearn

1100 Poydras Street, 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163

Megan S. Peterson

Attorney at Simon Peragine Smith & Redfearn

1100 Poydras Street, 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163

M. Davis Ready

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3000

New Orleans, LA 70163

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Joint STATUS REPORT by Jose Villatoro. (Spokes, James) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2020 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 8/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/8/2020. (SGO) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

3 #1

Attachment State Court Pleadings

#3

(#3) NOTICE of List of Parties and Pleadings by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Pleadings)(Wilkerson, Lacresha) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc... (Wilkerson, Lacresha) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

1 #2

Proposed Pleading; Notice of Removal to Plaintiff

1 #1

Proposed Pleading; Notice to State Court

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 691252. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2132151), filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Notice to State Court, #2 Proposed Pleading; Notice of Removal to Plaintiff)(Wilkerson, Lacresha) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint STATUS REPORT by Jose Villatoro. (Spokes, James) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2020 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 8/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/8/2020. (SGO) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of List of Parties and Pleadings by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Pleadings)(Wilkerson, Lacresha) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc... (Wilkerson, Lacresha) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 691252. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2132151), filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Notice to State Court, #2 Proposed Pleading; Notice of Removal to Plaintiff)(Wilkerson, Lacresha) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul H. Scott