This case was last updated from PACER on 02/14/2021 at 10:37:09 (UTC).

Villasana v. Principal Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/16/2020 Villasana filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Principal Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Darrin P. Gayles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-25112

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Darrin P. Gayles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lucia Villasana

Defendant

Principal Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward Philip Dabdoub

Attorney at Dabdoub Law Firm, PA.

1600 Ponce De Leon Blvd, Suite 1202

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Kevin P Schaefer

13255 S.W. 113 Terrace

Miami, FL 33186

Defendant Attorney

Leonor Maria Lagomasino

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

2525 Ponce De Leon Boulevard, 4Th Floor

Coral Gables, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Principal's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Lagomasino, Leonor) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Lagomasino, Leonor) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Lagomasino, Leonor) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leonor Maria Lagomasino on behalf of Principal Life Insurance Company. Attorney Leonor Maria Lagomasino added to party Principal Life Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Lagomasino, Leonor) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

4 #1

Affidavit Notice of Service of Process

#4

(#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Lucia Villasana. Principal Life Insurance Company served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Notice of Service of Process)(Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Principal Life Insurance Company. (kpe) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DISABILITY BENEFITS against Principal Life Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14047270, filed by Lucia Villasana. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Principal's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Lagomasino, Leonor) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before February 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) (Entered: 01/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Lagomasino, Leonor) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before January 28, 2021. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) (Entered: 01/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Lagomasino, Leonor) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leonor Maria Lagomasino on behalf of Principal Life Insurance Company. Attorney Leonor Maria Lagomasino added to party Principal Life Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Lagomasino, Leonor) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Lucia Villasana. Principal Life Insurance Company served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Notice of Service of Process)(Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Principal Life Insurance Company. (kpe) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DISABILITY BENEFITS against Principal Life Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14047270, filed by Lucia Villasana. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRINCIPAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY AN IOWA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward Philip Dabdoub