This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:11:53 (UTC).

Villarreal et al v. American Medical Collection Agency, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Property - Personal Property Fraud case was filed by Villarreal against American Medical Collection Agency, Inc in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17037

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Michael A. Hammer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jeffrey Grossman

Karina Gras

Rosa Villarreal

Defendants

LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS

AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY INC

In Re

AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:19-cv-05340. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiffs and LabCorp, by and through their undersigned counsel, that the time within which Defendant must answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to September 3, 2019. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiffs and LabCorp, by and through their undersigned counsel, agree that should the Related Actions not be consolidated into an MDL and should LabCorp respond to a complaint in another Related Action that LabCorp will likewise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on the same day. Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings answer due 9/3/2019. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 7/8/2019) (mro) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#16

(#16) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 7:19-cv-05302. Document filed by Karina Gras, Jeffrey Grossman, Rosa Villarreal.(Seeger, Christopher) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michelle Anne Kisloff on behalf of Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Kisloff, Michelle) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

6 #1

Certificate of Service

#9

No Description Available

#6

No Description Available

#5

No Description Available

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American Medical Collection Agency, Inc., and Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Karina Gras, Jeffrey Grossman, Rosa Villarreal. (Seeger, Christopher) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#12

(#12) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Kisloff, Michelle) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

15 #1

*Restricted*

#8

No Description Available

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Seeger, Christopher) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#14

(#14) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (Signed by MDL Panel on 8/9/2019) (sjo) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • Member Case Transferred in on 8/22/19 from the Southern District of New York 7:19-cv-05340 for MDL 2789 AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION (gh, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (gh, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:19-cv-05340. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (sjo) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (Signed by MDL Panel on 8/9/2019) (sjo) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiffs and LabCorp, by and through their undersigned counsel, that the time within which Defendant must answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to September 3, 2019. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiffs and LabCorp, by and through their undersigned counsel, agree that should the Related Actions not be consolidated into an MDL and should LabCorp respond to a complaint in another Related Action that LabCorp will likewise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on the same day. Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings answer due 9/3/2019. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 7/8/2019) (mro) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Kisloff, Michelle) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings.(Kisloff, Michelle) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michelle Anne Kisloff on behalf of Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Kisloff, Michelle) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American Medical Collection Agency, Inc., and Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Karina Gras, Jeffrey Grossman, Rosa Villarreal. (Seeger, Christopher) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:19-cv-05302-VB. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • CASE REFERRED TO Judge Vincent L. Briccetti as possibly related to 7:19cv5302. (sj) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 7:19-cv-05302. Document filed by Karina Gras, Jeffrey Grossman, Rosa Villarreal.(Seeger, Christopher) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Seeger, Christopher) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against American Medical Collection Agency, Inc., Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17036647)Document filed by Rosa Villarreal, Jeffrey Grossman, Karina Gras.(Seeger, Christopher) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.