This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/31/2021 at 09:12:44 (UTC).

Villareal, Ph.D. v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 Villareal, Ph D filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles Eskridge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-02857

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles Eskridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Samuel Villareal, Ph.D.

Defendant

Life Insurance Company of North America

Consolidated 3Rd Party Defendant

Texas A&M University

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Madison Tate Donaldson

Attorney at Marc Whitehead Assoc.

430 Heights Boulevard

Houston, TX 77007

Defendant Attorney

Linda P Wills

Attorney at Wilson Elser et al

909 Fannin Street, Ste 3300

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/16/2021 at 09:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Wills, Linda) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

6 #1

Proposed Order Granting Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America's

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 02/18/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 01/19/2022. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 08/17/2022. Deft Expert Report due by 09/16/2022. Discovery due by 10/31/2022. Mediation due by 01/18/2023. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/30/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/30/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 02/17/2023. Docket Call set for 03/20/2023 at 9:30 AM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jengonzalezadi) (Entered: 10/6/2021) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Life Insurance Company of North America, filed.(Wills, Linda) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America, filed.(Wills, Linda) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America, filed.(Wills, Linda) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Life Insurance Company of North America, filed.(Wills, Linda) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 02/18/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 01/19/2022. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 08/17/2022. Deft Expert Report due by 09/16/2022. Discovery due by 10/31/2022. Mediation due by 01/18/2023. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/30/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/30/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 02/17/2023. Docket Call set for 03/20/2023 at 9:30 AM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jengonzalezadi) (Entered: 10/6/2021) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Wills, Linda) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/16/2021 at 09:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Samuel Villareal, Ph.D., filed.(Donaldson, Madison) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Life Insurance Company of North America, filed.(Donaldson, Madison) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26981489) filed by Samuel Villareal, Ph.D.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Donaldson, Madison) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Texas A&M University is a litigant

Latest cases where Life Insurance Company of North America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Linda P Wills